judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL E. NETTLES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1262
Short Caption:MICHAEL E. NETTLES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11752-88Filed Date:10/25/1989

Opening Event Date:10/25/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/10/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael E. NettlesN
Melvin M. Dildine NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901NETTLES, MICHAEL E. UNITED STATES
10/25/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MELVIN M. DILDINE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD DSA
02/09/1990RECORD ON APPEAL TRANSCRIPT 48-PGS/SIMMS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 122689 SCHPRD R
05/31/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(5 PGS-BURNEY) PF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/16/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO DISMISS & CASE DISMISSED. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 102590 SCHPRD B
11/16/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
12/10/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD