judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONALD L. BLUE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1346
Short Caption:DONALD L. BLUE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4480-84Filed Date:11/15/1989

Opening Event Date:11/15/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/03/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonald L. Blue N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BLUE, DONALD L. UNITED STATES
11/15/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/28/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (MEMORANDUM OF JUDGE SALZMAN DATED 11/21/89) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/12/1989ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL PURSUANT TO APPELLANT'S OWN REQUEST. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
01/03/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990RECEIVED SR#6(97 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD