judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREGORY M. LEWIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1277
Short Caption:GREGORY M. LEWIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1269-89Filed Date:10/26/1989

Opening Event Date:10/26/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/05/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/31/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/12/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/11/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGregory M. Lewis N
Allan P. Mackinnon YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Shanlon WuYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LEWIS, GREGORY M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/02/12 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MACKINNONA FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - WUS FOR - APPELLEE
10/26/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALLAN P. MACKINNON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS AD PANEL SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD DSA
11/27/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GW PANEL SCDATE 121489 SCHPRD V
04/09/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) RJG PANEL SCDATE 122689 SCHPRD R
04/19/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (89 PGS. -- MILLER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 042990 SCHPRD RT
05/17/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(35 PGS/SWARINGER) (135 PGS/MOORE)(29 PGS/PAVLISH ) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/04/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(10 PGS/FINNERIN) AD PANEL SCDATE 041990 SCHPRD RT
06/05/1990FiledRecord Completed
06/05/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD CHECK
07/13/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-15-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD BA
07/18/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 08-15-90. NFX GR PANELFF SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD GR
08/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-15-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 081590 SCHPRD BA
09/05/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/15/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 081390 SCHPRD TO
09/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 30, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 091590 SCHPRD BA
10/02/1990RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FL LODGED BRF. FO APLE BRF SHALL BE FLD W/IN 30DYS FRM DT OF ORD. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 100490 SCHPRD GR
10/31/1990FiledBriefing Completed
10/31/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 111290 SCHPRD BE
02/12/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/12/1991ARGUED PANELRGTEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELRGTEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 594 A.2d 542
07/19/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 2041
08/02/1991PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC OF APLT PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1991APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALLAN P. MacKINNON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY ISSUANCE OF MANDATE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1991ORDER DENY APLT'S MOT TO STAY ISSU- ANCE OF MANDATE AS MOOT. SEE SUPREME CT R. 13.4. MEH PANELROTEFA SCDATE 101591 SCHPRD VS