judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KIM HOLSTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1275
Short Caption:KIM HOLSTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8901-88Filed Date:10/27/1989

Opening Event Date:10/27/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/20/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/01/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/12/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/29/1993

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKim Holston N
Joseph H. Green, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
David A. Payne NN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HOLSTON, KIM UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
10/27/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOSEPH H. GREEN, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD DSA
12/06/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (6 PGS/TREMEL) AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 122689 SCHPRD R
12/19/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(172 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 040790 SCHPRD RT
03/02/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 10 DAYS OR APPOINTMENT WILL BE VACATED JB PANELRO SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD BA
03/08/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 031290 SCHPRD BA
03/12/1990LETTER FROM JOSEPH H. GREEN JR. RE CASE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT. CWC PANELRBH SCDATE 032090 SCHPRD OPE
06/19/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 50-PGS/FRANKLIN AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (130 PGS. -- FRANKLIN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 060690 SCHPRD RT
06/20/1990RECORD COMPLETED
08/14/1990ORDER COUNSEL TO FL BRF W/IN 10 DAYS OR APPOINTMENT MAY BE VACATED. GW PANELRO SCDATE 080990 SCHPRD V
08/22/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-9-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 082490 SCHPRD BA
09/07/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FL LODGED BRF. APLE BRF SHALL BE FLD W/IN 30 DAYS FRM DT OF ORD. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 091190 SCHPRD GR
11/01/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 110990 SCHPRD BE
11/01/1990BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/12/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/12/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGTEWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1993REVERSED AND REMANDED Opinion
11/18/1993APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to expedite the issuance of the mandate
11/19/1993APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to appellant's motion to expedite the issuance of the mandate.
11/24/1993ORDER granting appellant's motion to expedite the issuance of the mandate and the Clerk is directed to issue the mandate forthwith. (ROTEWA)
11/29/1993MANDATE ISSUED