Case Information: 42813 | |||
Short Caption: | COUNTY OF LYON VS. DIST. CT. (ADVANCED SPECIALTY GASES) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 40285 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CI15061 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 01/20/2005 at 9:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 01/20/2005 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/18/2004 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 04-03149 | |
02/18/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 1. | 04-03151 | |
02/18/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 2. | 04-23834 | |
02/18/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 3. | 04-23835 | |
02/18/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 4. | 04-23836 | |
02/18/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 5. | 04-23837 | |
02/18/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 6. | 04-23838 | |
02/18/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 7. | 04-23839 | |
02/18/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 8. | 04-23840 | |
02/18/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 9. | 04-23841 | |
02/24/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on respondents' behalf, shall have 30 days from this order's date within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. | 04-03541 | |
03/25/2004 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Thereto. | 04-05650 | |
03/25/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appendix to Advanced Specialty Gases, Inc.'s Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Thereto. | 04-05651 | |
04/12/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. | 04-06729 | |
04/12/2004 | Other | Other. Received Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.clerk5 | 04-06730 | |
04/15/2004 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Petitioners' Request for Leave to File Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 04-06969 | |
07/26/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for Leave to File Reply. Presently before the court is petitioners' motion for leave to file a reply to the real party in interest's answer. The real party in interest has filed an opposition. We conclude that a reply to the answer will serve the interests of justice in this original writ proceeding. We grant petitioners' motion, and we direct the clerk of this court file the reply, which was provisionally received on April 12, 2004. | 04-13498 | |
07/26/2004 | Petition/Writ | Filed Reply to Answer to Petition. Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 04-06730 | |
09/03/2004 | Other | Other. Received Petitioner's Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 04-16171 | |
11/23/2004 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 20, 2005, at 9:30 a.m. (NNP05-WM/MD/RP) | ||
01/04/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | ||
01/20/2005 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP05-WM/MD/RP | ||
06/13/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP | 05-11515 | |
07/12/2005 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 05-12701 | |
07/12/2005 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |