judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT DUFFY, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1288
Short Caption:ROBERT DUFFY, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8817-88Filed Date:07/25/1989

Opening Event Date:07/25/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/26/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/19/1991
Argued/Submitted:12/01/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/26/1993

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert Duffy, Jr.N
Dennis M. O'Connor YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Thomas J. Tourish, Jr.NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DUFFY JR., ROBERT UNITED STATES
01/01/1902SCRND/SUM II
07/25/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/03/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DENNIS M. O'CONNOR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS AD PANEL SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD DSA
11/30/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GW PANEL SCDATE 121489 SCHPRD V
12/26/1989COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT MITCHELL (FILED IN 89-305) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/26/1989RECORD COMPLETED
08/20/1991ORDER CNSL FOR APLT TO ADVISE CRT AS TO STATUS OF RT OF 1/24-1/25/ 89 IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081991 SCHPRD X
08/27/1991APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER REGARDING THE STATUS OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 083091 SCHPRD ANSA
09/05/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS; BRF OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THERE- AFTER. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 082891 SCHPRD V
10/24/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1991RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1991ORDER GRT APLT MO FOR LV TO FL LODGE BRF, BRF IS FL. F/O BRF OF APLE DUE 11/27/91. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 110691 SCHPRD B
12/02/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 9, 1991 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 120291 SCHPRD BE
12/09/1991RECEIVED APLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1991ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FL LODGE BRF, BRF IS FL. F/O SCHED AS SOON AS CALENDAR PERMITS. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 121191 SCHPRD B
12/19/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/19/1991FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR II
01/29/1992 SUM II REQUEST F/ORAL ARGUMENT NOTICE - 10 DYS TO RSPND. CKT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/01/1992SUBMITTED FE KN MK
01/12/1993AFFIRMED: MOJ affirming judgment on appeal. (FEKNMK)
02/26/1993MANDATE ISSUED