judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DANIEL WILSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1278
Short Caption:DANIEL WILSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3811-89Filed Date:10/26/1989

Opening Event Date:10/26/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/29/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/04/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/03/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDaniel Wilson N
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Samia FamYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Nancy J. Woodward YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILSON, DANIEL AKA MICHAEL ROBINSON UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/12/04 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - FAMS FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SIMONA FOR - APPELLEE
10/26/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
11/13/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD DSA
12/08/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (19 PGS. -- WHALEN; 8 PGS. -- BURNEY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 122689 SCHPRD R
03/20/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-20-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 032090 SCHPRD BA
03/23/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 04-20-90; NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 032190 SCHPRD B
04/20/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 30, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD BA
04/30/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/29/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 29, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL LODGED BRF; GRT APLE MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 6/29/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 050890 SCHPRD V
06/29/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/29/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 062990 SCHPRD BE
11/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT FOR LV TO FL LODGED REPLY BRIEF. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 112090 SCHPRD VS
11/30/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 112990 SCHPRD OPE
12/04/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/04/1990ARGUED PANELRGWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1991MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL FOR SUGGESTION OF DEATH OF APLT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/13/1991FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
05/13/1991ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED PURSUANT TO SUGGESTION OF DEATH FILED BY COUNSEL. MEH PANELROWAPY SCDATE 120491 SCHPRD RDEC
05/13/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
06/03/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1991CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD