judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CALVIN LESESANE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1296
Short Caption:CALVIN LESESANE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F13533-88Filed Date:11/01/1989

Opening Event Date:11/01/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/17/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/19/1990
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/10/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCalvin Lesesane N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas C. Black YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LESESANE, CALVIN UNITED STATES
11/01/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/15/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER H. MEYERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD DSA
02/08/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD R
04/17/1990FiledRecord Completed
04/17/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (9-PGS/HAWKINS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 040590 SCHPRD RT
04/18/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 052990 SCHPRD BA
06/21/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 19,1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 062790 SCHPRD BE
06/28/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/19/90; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 062290 SCHPRD B
07/19/1990FiledBriefing Completed
07/19/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 071990 SCHPRD BE
10/09/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL OR AFFIRM AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/16/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT TO DISMISS & CASE REMOVED FROM 11/19/90 CAL MEH PANELNWWAKN SCDATE 101090 SCHPRD VS
11/16/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
12/10/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD