Case Information: 42815 | |||
Short Caption: | MCFARLAN VS. MAINOR & HARRIS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 39549 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A414350 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/24/2004 / Roitman, Howard | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/19/2004 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Richard R. Reed--check no. 1409. (Additional $50 due.) | ||
02/19/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 04-03204 | |
02/19/2004 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. (Additional $50 due.) Due Date: 10 days | ||
02/24/2004 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Howard Roitman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/03/2004 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Additional $50.00 from Richard R. Reed--check no. 1419. | ||
03/18/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to file Docketing Statement. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. | 04-05139 | |
03/29/2004 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 04-05863 | |
04/06/2004 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Howard Roitman. (docketing statement) | ||
06/14/2004 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 04-10929 | |
06/24/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. | 04-11518 | |
08/06/2004 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation and Order for Dismissal. | 04-14317 | |
08/11/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK | 04-14517 | |
08/11/2004 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |