judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM F. PATTERSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1289
Short Caption:WILLIAM F. PATTERSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F13263-88Filed Date:08/30/1989

Opening Event Date:08/30/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/11/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/17/1991
Argued/Submitted:12/16/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/08/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam F. Patterson N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
G. Bradley Weinsheimer YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PATTERSON, WILLIAM F. UNITED STATES
08/30/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/03/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(200 PGS/TREMEL) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BEVERLY G. STONE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD DSA
03/21/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR FRANKLIN CERTIFICATION OF 6/19/89 PROC (DID NOT TAKE CLOSING ARGUMENTS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/01/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLANT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DYS FROM DATE OF ORDER (REC COMPLETE) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL BRIEFING TRANSCRIPT IS COMPLETE RJG PANEL SCDATE 111290 SCHPRD BA
11/14/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO STAY BRFING TO EXTENT BRIEF IS FILED W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 110190 SCHPRD U
02/01/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (6 PGS. -- PIRFO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 012491 SCHPRD RT
03/11/1991ORDER APLT BRF TO BE FLD 6/12/91 & APLE BRF TO BE FLD 7/17/91. NX PANELRBH SCDATE 020691 SCHPRD GR
06/11/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 061291 SCHPRD BA
07/11/1991FiledRecord Completed
07/11/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (14 PGS/PAVLISH) PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (6-PGS/WATKINS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1991FiledBriefing Completed
07/17/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 071791 SCHPRD BE
07/17/1991RECEIVED COPY OF APLE'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD ON APL FILED IN SRCT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1991APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT FOR 14 DAY EXTENSION (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/07/1991ORDER GR MO OF APLT EX TM FL REPLY BRF TO 8/19/91. NFX. AD PANELJAC SCDATE 080691 SCHPRD K
08/19/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 081991 SCHPRD RBA
12/16/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/16/1991SUBMITTED PANELSCWGBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELSCWGBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/08/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD