judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GLENN S. HAMLIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1264
Short Caption:GLENN S. HAMLIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6182-88Filed Date:10/20/1989

Opening Event Date:10/20/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/27/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/10/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/06/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/09/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGlenn S. Hamlin N
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Hiram E. Puig-Lugo YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
M. Kathleen O'Connor YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAMLIN, GLENN S. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: CAROLINE HAMLIN AKA NOTE - 01 CAROL PHILLIPS NOTE - 02 042490 ORD: GRANT APLE'S MO TO NOTE - 02 CONSOLIDATE NOS. 89-1264 & NOTE - 03 89-1235; APLT'S BRIEF IN NO. NOTE - 03 89-1235 DUE IN 40 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 04 THE COMPLETE RECORD HAS BEEN NOTE - 04 FILED. NOTE - 05 CON. 89-1235 NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 071690 ORD: GRANT MO OF COUNS NOTE - 06 FOR APLT IN NO. 89-1235 TO NOTE - 07 WITHDRAW APPEAL & THE APNTMT NOTE - 07 OF KENNETH A. VANCE, ESQ, IS NOTE - 08 VACATED, & MONORANJA BEZBORAUH NOTE - 08 ESQ, IS APPOINTED TO REPRESENT NOTE - 09 APLT IN NO 89-1235, F/O THAT NOTE - 09 BRF OF APLT IN NO 89-1235 TO NOTE - 10 BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 10
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/03/06 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - PUIG-LUGOH FOR - APLT GLENN ATTY 2 - BEZBORUAHM FOR - APLT CAROLINE ATTY 3 - OCONNORK FOR - APPELLEE
10/20/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/13/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD DSA
12/12/1989DESIGNATION OF RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1989FiledRecord Completed
12/27/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (342 PGS/BREMEN) AD PANEL SCDATE 121989 SCHPRD R
01/31/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(11 PGS/KACZOROWSKI) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 5, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD BA
02/20/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/5/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 020890 SCHPRD V
03/06/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD BA
03/21/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE W/89-1235 AND REVISE BE. AD PANEL SCDATE 040490 SCHPRD BE
04/24/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 4. GW PANELRO SCDATE 041790 SCHPRD V
06/13/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/16/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06 THUR 10 GW PANELRO SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD BA
08/27/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 89-1235 TO SEPTEMBER 4TH AJ PANEL SCDATE 082790 SCHPRD BA
10/09/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 89-1235. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT & BRF OF APLT IN 89-1235 IS FL; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 092490 SCHPRD GR
10/10/1990FiledBriefing Completed
10/10/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 110890 SCHPRD BE
10/15/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT IN 89-1235 TO WITH- DRAW ARG I OF APPELLANT'S BRF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/05/1990LETTER FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE: THE SCHEDULING OF ORAL ARG. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO IN NO. 89-1235 FOR LV TO W/D ARGUMENT 1 OF HER BRF. GW PANELRO SCDATE 110190 SCHPRD TO
02/11/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1991LETTER GRANT APLT'S RQST OF 2/11/91 TO PRESENT ORAL ARGUMENT. CT PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/06/1991ARGUED PANELRGFEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGFNKE SCDATE 030691 SCHPRD RDEC
03/18/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/09/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD