judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STEVEN MAXFIELD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1263
Short Caption:STEVEN MAXFIELD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F223-89Filed Date:10/25/1989

Opening Event Date:10/25/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/15/1992Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/19/1992
Argued/Submitted:09/16/1993
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/12/1993

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantStephen Maxfield N
Keith Winston WattersYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MAXFIELD, STEVEN UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 07/31/90 ORD: VACATING APTMT NOTE - 01 OF RICHARD K. GILBERT, ESQ; FO NOTE - 02 MOT FOR SERVICES OTHER THAN NOTE - 02 COUNSEL UNDER CJA IS DENIED ON NOTE - 03 BASIS ON THE FINDING CONTAINED NOTE - 03 IN ORD OF TR CT DATED 12/19/89 NOTE - 04 VIZ., THAT APLT'S FAMILY IS NOTE - 04 ABLE TO PAY COUNSEL FEES; FO NOTE - 05 COUNSEL FOR APLT SHALL, W/IN NOTE - 05 20 DAYS, FILE STMT INDICATING NOTE - 06 WHETHER RT WILL BE PREPARED AT NOTE - 06 APLT'S EXPENSE FOR APPEAL. NOTE - 07 9/21/90 ORD: TREAT APLT'S EX NOTE - 07 PARTE STATE AS MO FOR RECONSID NOTE - 08 ERATION OF 7/31/90 ORD & DENY NOTE - 08 W/OUT PREJ TO FLNG APPROP MO NOTE - 09 IN THE TRL CRT. NOTE - 09 NOTE - 10 10/09/91 ORD: CNSL FOR APLT TO NOTE - 10 MAKE ARRANGEMENTS TO ASSURE NOTE - 11 TRANSCRIPT IS ORDERED & ADVISE NOTE - 11 THIS CRT OF STATUS OF PENDING NOTE - 12 TRANSCRIPT W/10 DYS FRM DT NOTE - 12 OF THIS ORDER.
01/01/1906 GILBERTR VACATED PER 7/31/90 ORDER
10/25/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD K. GILBERT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1989APPEARANCE OF KEITH W. WATTERS FOR APPELLANT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD DSA
02/09/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 122689 SCHPRD R
03/09/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SERVICES OTHER THAN COUNSEL UNDER CJA AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1990ORDER (SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 6) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/20/1990APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE RE TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 082090 SCHPRD SRT
09/21/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-09. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (6-PGS/TANNER/10-PGS RUST) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (JUDGE KESSLER'S ORDER DATED 2/12/91) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1991ORDER APLT BRF DUE W/IN 40 DYS FRM DT OF ORDER. APLE BRF DUE W/IN 30 DYS THEREAFTER. NFX. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 062891 SCHPRD U
08/19/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 090391 SCHPRD BA
09/18/1991ORDER GR MO OF APLT EXT TM FL BRF. APLT TO FL STATE W/IN 20 AS TO STATUS OF RT. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 091091 SCHPRD K
10/03/1991STATEMENT OF APLT RE STATUS OF RT PMB PANEL SCDATE 100891 SCHPRD STATE
10/09/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07 - 12 GR PANELRBH SCDATE 100491 SCHPRD TO
10/16/1991STATEMENT OF APLT RE: TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 102191 SCHPRD CHECK
10/23/1991ORDER APLT TO FL STATE OF STATUS OF RT W/IN 20. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 101891 SCHPRD K
10/30/1991STATEMENT OF APLT RE: TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 111291 SCHPRD STATE
12/18/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF CRT RPTR GRAYBILL FOR EXT. OF TM TO FL TRIAL PROC. TO 1/27/92. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1991ORDER GR MO OF CT RPTR GRAYBILL FOR EXT OF TM TO FL TR OF TRIAL PROC. TO 1/27/92. NFX. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/15/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (215 PGS. -- HOLLAND) (8/22-23/89 PROCEEDINGS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 122791 SCHPRD RT
01/15/1992RECORD COMPLETED
02/25/1992ORDER APLT BRF DUE W/IN 40 DYS FRM DT OF ORDER. APLE BRF DUE W/IN 30 DYS THEREAFTER. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 021292 SCHPRD GR
04/17/1992RECEIVED appellant's brief (maxb still pending).
04/24/1992Grant the motion of appellant for an extension of time within which to file brief and the lodged brief is filed. Appellee brief to be filed on or before May 21, 1992.
04/24/1992APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/18/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (10-pgs/rust 3/23/89)
05/19/1992APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/19/1992APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD exhibits 1-3 attached - assented
05/19/1992BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/03/1992ORD GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD and the Clerk, Superior Court shall transmit exhibits attached to appellee's motion are hereby filed as a supp record.
06/03/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD
04/27/1993FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
09/16/1993FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/16/1993SUBMITTED (RO,FE,NW)
09/17/1993AFFIRMED MOJ (RO,FE,NW)
10/12/1993MANDATE ISSUED