judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HERBERT L. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1259
Short Caption:HERBERT L. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4665-89Filed Date:10/19/1989

Opening Event Date:10/19/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:09/25/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/26/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHerbert L. Williams N
Sheila Thurmond MayersYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Ann L. Rosenfield YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, HERBERT L. UNITED STATES
11/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) SHEILA T. MAYERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD DSA
12/19/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (7 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD R
12/21/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/21/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(177 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 040890 SCHPRD RT
01/30/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO THIRTY DAY (30) AJ PANEL SCDATE 013090 SCHPRD BA
02/27/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 032790 SCHPRD BA
02/27/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF FOR 30 DAYS; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 021590 SCHPRD V
04/05/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 032990 SCHPRD BA
04/05/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1990ORDER APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FL LODGED BRF GRANTD. APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DYS FROM DTD OF ORD. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 042390 SCHPRD Q
05/07/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 052890 SCHPRD BE
09/25/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWTEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1990VACATED IN PART/AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART MOJ VACATING CONVICTION FOR UUV; REMANDING FOR RESENTEN- CING & AFFIRMING REMAING JMTS PANELNWTEMK SCDATE 092590 SCHPRD RDEC
10/31/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE (UUMV CONVICTION VACATED)
11/26/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD