judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

UNITED STATES V. CLARENCE COOPER

Case Information: 89-CF-1246
Short Caption:UNITED STATES V. CLARENCE COOPERClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6109-88Filed Date:10/25/1989

Opening Event Date:10/25/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/17/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeClarence Cooper N
Arthur M. Reynolds NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901UNITED STATES COOPER, CLARENCE
10/25/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/06/1989RECEIVED COPY OF MEMORANDUM OPINION OF JUDGE BURNETTE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GW PANEL SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD V
02/06/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 122689 SCHPRD R
03/20/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (ORDER/J. QUEEN 3/7/91 PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1991FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
04/26/1991ORDER GRT APLT MO TO DISMISS & THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED. JJ PANELJWR SCDATE 040591 SCHPRD GR
04/26/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
05/17/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD