judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HAYWOOD PHILLIPS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0197
Short Caption:HAYWOOD PHILLIPS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Lead: 87-CF-0102 Consolidated: 87-CF-0115 , 87-CF-0197, 87-CF-0290
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7969-85Filed Date:02/20/1987

Opening Event Date:02/20/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/01/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/30/1988
Argued/Submitted:03/14/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/22/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHaywood Phillips N
Richard S. Greenlee YN
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Geoffrey R. Brigham YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PHILLIPS, HAYWOOD UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 07 CON 87-102 AND 87-290 NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 6/29/87 ORD: SUA SPONTE THAT NOTE - 08 APPEAL NOS. 87-102, 87-115, NOTE - 09 87-197 & 87-290 ARE HEREBY CON NOTE - 09 FOR ALL PURPOSES, FO MOS GRT NOTE - 10 ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT THE NOTE - 10 APLT'S BR IN NOS. 87-197 & NOTE - 11 87-290 DUE IN 30 DAYS; THIS NOTE - 11 CT'S 5/26/87, ORD IN NO. NOTE - 12 87-115 IS HEREBY VACATED & BR NOTE - 12 OF APLT IN NO. 87-115 DUE IN NOTE - 13 30 DAYS; CON BR OF APLE DUE 30 NOTE - 13 DAYS THEREAFTER. NOTE - 14 7/15/87 ORD: DISMISSING 87-115 NOTE - 14 AS A DUPLICATE OF 87-102; NOTE - 15 BRIEFS OF APLTS IN 87-197 AND NOTE - 15 87-290 REMAIN DUE TO BE FILED NOTE - 16 ON OR BEFORE 7/29/87. NOTE - 16 NOTE - 17 11/16/87 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO NOTE - 17 IN NO 87-290 TO FILE BRIEF ON NOTE - 18 OR BEF 11/27/87 (NFX). FO THAT NOTE - 18 THE CONSOLIDATED BRIEF OF APLE NOTE - 19 SHALL BE FILED 30 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 19 APLT'S BRIEF IN NO 87-290.
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/03/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GOODBREADR FOR - APLT MORRIS ATTY 2 - GREENLEER FOR - APLT PHILLIPS ATTY 3 - BRIGHAMG FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 BRIGHAMG GEOFFREY R. BRIGHTAM
02/20/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/27/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (1,237 PGS - BURNS) JB PANEL SCDATE 042087 SCHPRD RT
04/14/1987RECEIVED NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED BY APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 042187 SCHPRD R
04/22/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (68 PGS - HART) PB PANEL SCDATE 060187 SCHPRD RT
04/24/1987ORDER APLT DSA DUE W/IN 10 DAYS; BR OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 040687 SCHPRD DSA
05/01/1987FiledRecord Completed
05/01/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 050487 SCHPRD DSA
05/14/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (79 PGS - HUNT) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 13TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 061087 SCHPRD BA
06/19/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-102 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 8 THRU 13 TTC PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 14-16 CWC PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-290 TO SEPTEMBER 28TH JB PANEL SCDATE 072987 SCHPRD BA
07/29/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 19TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 072987 SCHPRD BA
08/03/1987ORDER RECORD IN 87-115 IS DEEMED RECORD IN 87-102. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1987ORDER BRFS OF APLTS IN NO. 87-197 & NO. 87-290 DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD CHECK
09/28/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-290 TO NOVEMBER 27TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/8/87 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 091887 SCHPRD BA
10/19/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OUT OF TIME (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 100887 SCHPRD CHECK
10/19/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS.DAS PANELPY SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD OPE
11/16/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 17 THRU 19 SL PANELPY SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD OPE
11/30/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-290 TO JANUARY 27, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 112787 SCHPRD BA
12/14/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT IN 87-290 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/27/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 120987 SCHPRD OPE
01/27/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-290 TO MARCH 11TH JB PANEL SCDATE 012788 SCHPRD BA
02/23/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APT IN 87-290 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/11/88; ANFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 020988 SCHPRD OPE
03/11/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-290 TO 4/9/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 031188 SCHPRD BA
04/11/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 15TH IN 87-290 JB PANEL SCDATE 032388 SCHPRD OPE
05/03/1988ORDER BRF OF APLT IN 87-290 DUE BY 5/15/88 OR COUNSEL FOR APLT REFERRED TO BPR. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 042588 SCHPRD OPE
05/16/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF OF APPELLANT IN 87-290 RJG PANEL SCDATE 051588 SCHPRD BA
07/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/22/88 RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 061588 SCHPRD BE
08/10/1988APPEARANCE OF GEOFFREY R. BRIGHAM AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/21/88 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD BE
08/26/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 9/21/88-NFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 081788 SCHPRD V
09/19/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 23RD (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 092188 SCHPRD BE
09/23/1988RECEIVED APELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1988FiledBriefing Completed
09/30/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 092988 SCHPRD CHECK
01/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(STIPULATION AND EXHIBIT VIDEO CASSETTE) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/13/1989LETTER FRM USA RE: MISSTATEMENT MADE IN REPLY BRIEF OF HAYWOOD PHILLIPS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/13/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 3/13/89 LTR OF APLE TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 030889 SCHPRD VS
03/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO SUBMIT 87- 102;GRANT MO OF APLT TO FL RBA IN THIS CASE & CLK TO FL. DAS PANELROMKPY SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD OPE
03/13/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/14/1989ARGUED PANELRGMKPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1989AFFIRMED JDGMT AF JDGMT OF CONVICTION PANELRGMKPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -MK CITE
09/29/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - MK PAGE # - 2211
10/03/1989APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING IN 87-290 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1989LETTER FROM HAYWOOD PHILLIPS RE CASE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1989APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING TO NOVEMBER 6, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING ON OR BEFORE 11/6/89 SL PANELRO SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD OPE
11/03/1989PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC OF APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1989RECEIVED APLT'S PETITION FOR RE/REHEAR- ING EN BANC AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD