Case Information: 42843 | |||
Short Caption: | MCKINNEY VS. FIRST SAVINGS BANK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A439338 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Douglas | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Becker for Justice Douglas | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | 03/16/2004 / Haberfeld, Stephen | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | 09/14/2005 at 10:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 09/14/2005 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/26/2004 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Berkley, Gordon & Goldstein, LLP--check no. 10089. | ||
02/26/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 04-03687 | |
03/05/2004 | Other | Other. Filed Notice of Entry of Order (not filed in the district court or certified). | 04-04200 | |
03/08/2004 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 04-04405 | |
03/09/2004 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael D. Davidson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/16/2004 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. | ||
04/19/2004 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
06/08/2004 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 04-10559 | |
06/10/2004 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 04-10750 | |
06/22/2004 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 04-11310 | |
10/06/2004 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 04-18467 | |
10/06/2004 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. | 04-18468 | |
11/05/2004 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 04-20413 | |
11/18/2004 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. --Amended Certificate of Service for Respondent's Answering Brief. | 04-21301 | |
12/08/2004 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 04-22372 | |
02/22/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Firm Name Change. McCullough & Associates is now McCullough, Perez & Associates, Ltd. | 05-03546 | |
04/13/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. 1/20/04 order granting motion for partial summary judgment. Due Date: 10 days | ||
04/21/2005 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copies of Order Regarding Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Breach of Written Contract Claim filed in district court on 1/15/04 and Notice of Entry of Order filed 1/20/04; and Order Regarding Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment--Chapter 627 filed in district court on 1/15/04 and Notice of Entry of Order filed 1/20/04. | 05-07786 | |
05/18/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on June 15, 2005, at 10:30 a.m. (SNP05-RR/MG/JH) | ||
05/24/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion. | 05-10191 | |
05/31/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Vacating Argument and Setting for Submission. Order Granting Motion to Continue Oral Argument. We hereby vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for June 15, 2005, at 10:30 a.m., and direct the clerk of this court to schedule this appeal for oral argument on the next available calendar. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | 05-10545 | |
07/13/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Unavailability of Counsel. | 05-13958 | |
07/15/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on September 14, 2005, at 10:30 a.m. (NNP06R-NB/RR/RP) | ||
08/31/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | ||
09/14/2005 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP06R-NB/RR/RP | ||
10/18/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06R-NB/RR/RP | 05-20646 | |
11/04/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Berkley, Gordon & Goldstein, LLP--check no. 11630. | ||
11/04/2005 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | 05-21791 | |
12/20/2005 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP06R-NB/RR/RP | 05-24742 | |
01/17/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-00411 | |
01/17/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/25/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 19, 2006. | 06-00411 |