judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THOMAS E. WILSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0194
Short Caption:THOMAS E. WILSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5676-86Filed Date:02/25/1987

Opening Event Date:02/25/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/27/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantThomas E. Wilson N
Edward C. Sussman NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILSON, THOMAS E. UNITED STATES
02/25/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) EDWARD C. SUSSMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD R
04/28/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD DSA
08/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (70 PGS - RHOADES) JB PANEL SCDATE 073088 SCHPRD RT
09/08/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(173 PGS /SCHOCH) PANEL SCDATE 082088 SCHPRD RT
03/27/1989FiledRecord Completed
03/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(127 PGS/SHELTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 120188 SCHPRD RT
03/28/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-8-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD BA
05/16/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/8/89. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 051289 SCHPRD BA
06/08/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 060889 SCHPRD BA
06/22/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/22/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO DISMISS & DISMISS APPEAL. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 062089 SCHPRD M
06/22/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
07/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD