Case Information: 42825 | |||
Short Caption: | MORELAND (MARRIO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 47860 , 48115 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C196411 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/20/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/20/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 04-03346 | |
02/26/2004 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 11/13/03 and 12/30/03. Court Reporter: Joanie E. Grime. | 04-03701 | |
03/30/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 04-05928 | |
03/30/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 04-05930 | |
04/02/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 04-06142 | |
05/28/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP04D-RR/WM/MD | 04-09932 | |
06/22/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-10350 | |
06/22/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/04/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 24, 2004. | 04-10350 |