Case Information: 42833 | |||
Short Caption: | ASHBAUGH VS. GUTIERREZ | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A447075 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Douglas | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Becker for Justice Douglas | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | 03/09/2004 / Davidson, Michael | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/15/2005 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/24/2004 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Albert D. Massi, Ltd.--check no. 44602. | ||
02/24/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 04-03509 | |
03/09/2004 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael D. Davidson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/10/2004 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 04-04533 | |
03/11/2004 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Michael D. Davidson. (docketing statement) | ||
05/24/2004 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 04-09531 | |
05/28/2004 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 04-09874 | |
06/09/2004 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
06/14/2004 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/12/04. To Court Reporter: Joanie Grime. | 04-10862 | |
06/22/2004 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: January 12, 2004. Court Reporter: Joanie E. Grime. | 04-11346 | |
08/25/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant: 30 days from the date of this order. We note that if Ashbaugh obtains a written order from the district court resolving the claims against Jimenez-Ramirez in response to this court, he must file an amended notice of appeal with the district court within the time frame set forth in NRAP 4(a)(1). If Ashbaugh obtains a proper order from the district court certifying its summary judgment order as final under NRCP 54(b), the notice of appeal already filed is effective and no amended notice of appeal is required. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondents may file any reply within 10 days from the date that Ashbaugh's response is served. | 04-15368 | |
09/23/2004 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 04-17646 | |
10/14/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. On August 25, 2004, we ordered appellant to show cause why his appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant obtained a proper NRCP 54(b) certification order that expressly directed the entry of judgment and determined that there was no just reason for delay. The notice of appeal already filed is effective and an amended notice of appeal is not required. We reinstate the briefing schedule. Appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve his opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 04-19100 | |
12/09/2004 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 04-22469 | |
12/09/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 04-22470 | |
04/01/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to file Answering Brief. Respondents shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file and serve the answering brief. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against respondents' counsel. Appellant may file a reply brief, if deemed necessary, within 30 days from service of the answering brief. | 05-06414 | |
04/15/2005 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 05-07385 | |
04/26/2005 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 05-08205 | |
11/15/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 05-22402 | |
11/15/2005 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP06R-NB/RR/RP | ||
12/20/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06R-NB/RR/RP | 05-24790 | |
01/17/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-00477 | |
01/17/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/25/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 19, 2006. | 06-00477 |