judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

UNITED STATES FIDELITY AND KAFTARIAN M D, HAYK L.

Case Information: 86-CV-0172
Short Caption:UNITED STATES FIDELITY AND KAFTARIAN M D, HAYK L.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA14435-84Filed Date:01/17/1986

Opening Event Date:01/17/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/13/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/20/1986
Argued/Submitted:11/03/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Walter J. Murphy YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Brian C. Shevlin YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Andrew E. VernickNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901UNITED STATES FIDELITY AND GUARANTEE COMPANY KAFTARIAN M D, HAYK L.
01/17/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/13/1986FiledRecord Completed
05/20/1986FiledBriefing Completed
11/03/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/22/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition