Case Information: 42832 | |||
Short Caption: | EDDY VS. DIST. CT. (TOWNSHIP OF RENO) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030158 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/24/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/24/2004 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ. | 04-03507 | |
02/24/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. | 04-03508 | |
02/24/2004 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Related Case. | 04-03567 | |
03/05/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP04S-MS/NB/MG | 04-04159 | |
03/23/2004 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | 04-05489 | |
05/05/2004 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP04S-MS/NB/MG | 04-08237 | |
06/02/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 04-08304 | |
06/02/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |