judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THEODORE WARE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0528
Short Caption:THEODORE WARE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 88-CF-0496 Consolidated: 88-CF-0526 , 88-CF-0527 , 88-CF-0528
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5705-87Filed Date:05/11/1988

Opening Event Date:05/11/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/28/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/13/1989
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/15/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTheodore Ware N
Steven Weinberg YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
George J. Lane YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WARE, THEODORE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: TALMADGE E. VAUGHN NOTE - 01 NOTE - 03 CON 88-496, 88-526, 88-527 NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 12/14/89 ORD: THIS CT'S ORDER NOTE - 04 OF 11/22/89 IS AMENDED TO NOTE - 05 REFLECT THAT APPEAL NO. 88-528 NOTE - 05 IS REMANDED TO THE TRIAL CT. NOTE - 06 FO THAT APPEAL NO. 88-526 IS NOTE - 06 REINSTATED AND THE CLK IS NOTE - 07 DIRTD TO SCHD CASE FOR NOTE - 07 CONSIDERATION BEFORE A MERITS NOTE - 08 DIV AS SOON AS CALENDAR NOTE - 08 PERMITS. NOTE - 09 12/28/89 ORD: APPEAL NOS. 88- NOTE - 09 526 & 88-527 SHALL REMAIN ON NOTE - 10 CAL; PARTIES TO BE PRESENT IN NOTE - 10 DCCA COURTROOM BY 9:25 A.M.
05/11/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/11/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/27/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD DSA
06/09/1988ORDER SS,CON 88-526,88-527 & 88-528 CLK SUP CT TO FL RECORD FORTH- WITH. PB PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1988FiledRecord Completed
07/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (71 PGS - KACZOROWSKI) GT IN #88-526 GT PANEL SCDATE 071088 SCHPRD RT
08/29/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(328 PGS CARTER) AD PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD RT
09/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (397 PGS - FINNERIN) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(259 PGS/FINNERIN) AD PANEL SCDATE 080288 SCHPRD RT
11/01/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (14 PGS RT - HAWKINS) GT PANEL SCDATE 072888 SCHPRD RT
04/12/1989ORDER SS, CONS W/88-496, 88-526, 88-527; APLT BRF DUE IN 40 DAYS. ACG PANELRO SCDATE 113088 SCHPRD CHECK
05/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 22ND (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 050289 SCHPRD BA
06/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/22/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 052989 SCHPRD CHECK
06/22/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 17TH (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 062289 SCHPRD BA
07/06/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MOTION FOR EXT OF TIME TO FILE BRF TO 7/17/89. ANY FUR REQ W/BE DISFAVORED.PB PANELRBH SCDATE 070389 SCHPRD CHECK
07/07/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO SEVER CONS. APPEALS 88-526,527,528 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD BA
08/09/1989ORDER DENY MO OF APLT TO SEVER NOS. 88-526, -527, & -528. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 072689 SCHPRD Q
08/16/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 21ST JB PANEL SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD BE
09/18/1989ORDER GRT APLE'S MO TO FILE BRF ON OR BEFORE 9/21/89 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 083089 SCHPRD N
09/21/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/22/89 GG PANEL SCDATE 092189 SCHPRD BE
09/25/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989FiledBriefing Completed
10/13/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLE IS FL ; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD OPA
11/28/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLE TO CLARIFY AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/14/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 4 THRU 8 SL PANELRO SCDATE 120889 SCHPRD CHECK
12/14/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
12/15/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1989ORDER SUA SPONTE REMOVING 88-528 & 88-496 FROM REG CAL OF 2/15/90 (SEE NOTE FIELDS 9-10) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD