judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY C. KELLEM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0530
Short Caption:ANTHONY C. KELLEM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7748-87Filed Date:04/27/1988

Opening Event Date:04/27/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/24/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/16/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/18/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony C. Kellem N
William Michael Whelan NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas C. Black YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KELLEM, ANTHONY C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 062888 ORDER: DENY APLT MO FOR NOTE - 01 RT W/OUT PREJUDICE TO ITS RE- NOTE - 02 NEWAL BEFORE THE TRIAL CRT FOR NOTE - 02 ITS CONS IN THE FIRST INSTANCE NOTE - 03 COUNSEL, W/IN 10 DAYS TO FILE NOTE - 03 AN APPROPRIATE MO FOR PRODUC- NOTE - 04 TION OF RT W/THE TRIAL CT & NOTE - 04 SERVE THIS COURT.
04/27/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/20/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM MICHAEL WHELAN, JR., PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 053088 SCHPRD DSA
06/07/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1988RECEIVED COPY OF ORDER DATED 6/16/88 FROM TRIAL JUDGE HANNON RE TRANSCRIPT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1988FiledRecord Completed
06/24/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) JB PANEL SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD R
06/28/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062188 SCHPRD M
07/11/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT PER ORDER 6/28/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 070888 SCHPRD STATE
07/22/1988ORDER APT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 071388 SCHPRD M
08/22/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (169 PGS RT - IRVING) GT PANEL SCDATE 112488 SCHPRD RT
10/03/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD BA
10/28/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 7TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 110788 SCHPRD BE
12/09/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AND FEE AD PANEL SCDATE 120788 SCHPRD DSA
12/09/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PB PANEL SCDATE 120788 SCHPRD BE
12/09/1988$50.00 DOCKETING FEE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/16/1988FiledBriefing Completed
12/16/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 121588 SCHPRD V
05/18/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/18/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELMKNWTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1989SUBMITTED PANELMKNWTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD