judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GOITOM (MESFIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34765
Short Caption:GOITOM (MESFIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 7367Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/02/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08241
09/15/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: April 13, 14, 15, 1999. Court Reporter: Polly C. Stipke. 99-08695
09/29/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-09313
09/29/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-09314
10/25/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-10433
12/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The state shall file an appendix containing the charging document with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. 99-12127
12/20/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 99-12938
03/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-05136
04/25/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-06615
04/25/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 27, 2000. 00-06615