judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC MANUEL V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-0870
Short Caption:ERIC MANUEL V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAP6866-09Filed Date:07/09/2010

Opening Event Date:07/09/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/05/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/20/2010
Argued/Submitted:05/17/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/08/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric Manuel N
Anthony Graham, Sr.YY
AppelleeD.C. Department of HealthN
Todd S. KimNY
Stacy L. AndersonYY
AppelleeDistrict of Columbia Department of Human RightsN
Todd S. KimNY
Stacy L. AndersonYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/23/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 9, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b) (3) (A). (JAC) elp
08/05/2010RECORD INDEX
08/05/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (agency record 1 vol. file 11/19/09)
08/05/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/09/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App.R. 31. (JAC) elp
09/17/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
09/17/2010APPENDIX
10/19/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 11/19/10 dc
11/03/2010 On consideration of appellees' motion for an extension of time to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellees' brief shall be filed on or before November 19, 2010. (JAC) elp
11/18/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until December 20, 2010 (opp) (elp)
12/02/2010 On consideration of appellees' motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellees' brief shall be filed on or before December 20, 2010. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
12/20/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
12/20/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/02/2011FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
02/02/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of April 2011 through June 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by FEB. 14, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
02/03/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
02/14/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/17/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/17/2011FiledARGUED before Washington,Oberly,King. Anthony Graham Sr.Esq.,for appellant. Stacy L.Anderson Esq.,for appellee.
06/17/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Oberly, Associate Judge, and King, Senior Judge.)
07/08/2011MANDATE ISSUED