judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CITY OF WICHITA FALLS, TEXAS v. R. C. BOWEN, TRUSTEE

Case: A-22
A-22
01/10/1944
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF WICHITA FALLS, TEXAS
R. C. BOWEN, TRUSTEE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/29/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/18/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
01/13/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
01/10/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/29/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/02/1944Document received (See Remarks)
02/02/1944Document received (See Remarks)
01/18/1944Brief in Support of Petition
01/13/1944Response to Petition
01/10/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/10/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
R. C. Bowen, TrusteeRespondent
CITY OF WICHITA FALLS, TEXASPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information