judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

REBBIE R. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0609
Short Caption:REBBIE R. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12080-87Filed Date:05/27/1988

Opening Event Date:05/27/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/01/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/12/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/14/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/08/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRebbie R. Williams N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Helen M. Bollwerk YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, REBBIE R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ELIAS SPARKS NOTE - 01
05/27/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/06/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL J. DOWD, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 061688 SCHPRD DSA
07/28/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 072688 SCHPRD R
08/10/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 2/9/88 RT FROM CT RPTR BURNS. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/01/1989FiledRecord Completed
01/30/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(184 PGS/MOORE) AD PANEL SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD RT
03/21/1989ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 080288 SCHPRD RT
05/08/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, ON OR BEF 5/23/89 TO FILE BA OR APPEAL MAY BE DISMISSED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 8, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 052389 SCHPRD BA
05/16/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/8/89. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 051289 SCHPRD M
06/07/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 060889 SCHPRD BA
07/12/1989FiledBriefing Completed
07/12/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 071289 SCHPRD BE
12/14/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/14/1989SUBMITTED PANELTESCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELTESCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/08/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD