judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERRENCE L. WATERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0533
Short Caption:TERRENCE L. WATERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Kidnapping
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10763-86Filed Date:05/04/1988

Opening Event Date:05/04/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/01/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/11/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/06/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/18/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTerrence L. Waters N
James W. KleinNY
John M. Mott YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas J. Tourish, Jr.YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WATERS, TERRENCE L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/11/90 ORD: GRANTG MO OF APLE NOTE - 01 FOR LV TO SUPP THE REC; CLK TO NOTE - 02 FILE THE TRANSCRIBED COPY OF NOTE - 02 APLT'S VIDEOTAPED STMT AS A NOTE - 03 SUPP RECORD; GRANTG MO OF APLE NOTE - 03 FOR LV TO FILE APLE'S BRF; CLK NOTE - 04 TO FILE LODGED BRIEF. NOTE - 04
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/09/06 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MOTTJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - CONNOLLYT FOR - APPELLEE
05/04/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/02/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1988ORDER APLT DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 061388 SCHPRD DSA
07/06/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD DSA
07/21/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 070488 SCHPRD R
08/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER COMPLETION OF THE RECORD & TRANSCRIPT RJG PANEL SCDATE 083088 SCHPRD BA
08/04/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(726 PGS/CARTER) AD PANEL SCDATE 090288 SCHPRD RT
06/01/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/01/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(12 PGS/WILLIAMS)TAPE AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
06/01/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(14 PGS/WILLIAMS)TAPE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE UNTIL THE TRANSCRIPT IS COMPLETED JB PANEL SCDATE 071189 SCHPRD BA
07/20/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1989ORDER GRANT MO FOR STAY; CLERK OF SUPR CRT TO FL RT; APLT BRF DUE 40 DAYS THEREAFTER. ACG PANELRO SCDATE 071489 SCHPRD U
07/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (62 PGS - RHOADES) GT PANEL SCDATE 080189 SCHPRD RT
08/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/27/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 082989 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/27/89. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 082989 SCHPRD N
09/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-27-89 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 092789 SCHPRD BA
10/03/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/27/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 092889 SCHPRD M
10/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 6, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 102789 SCHPRD BA
11/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRO SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD Q
12/15/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 17, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 122789 SCHPRD BE
01/05/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRIEF TO 1/17/90. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 010390 SCHPRD V
01/17/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 16, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 011790 SCHPRD BE
02/14/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 16, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MOS TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/16/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 030209 SCHPRD V
03/15/1990MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT JOINT STIPULATION FOR INCLU- SION IN THE RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR ONE DAY AD PANEL SCDATE 031690 SCHPRD BE
03/19/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1990FiledBriefing Completed
04/11/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 040590 SCHPRD TO
04/11/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (TRANSCRIBED COPY OF APLT'S VIDEOTAPED STATEMENT) CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1990RECEIVED APLT'S REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/23/1990ORDER GRT APLT'S MO AND THE LODGED REPLY BRF OF APLT IS HEREBY FILED SL PANELFF SCDATE 082090 SCHPRD VS
08/23/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/06/1990ARGUED PANELSTSCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF CONVICTIONS APPEALED FROM PANELSTSCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/18/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD