judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RANDALL E. CASH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0286
Short Caption:RANDALL E. CASH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5068-86Filed Date:03/17/1987

Opening Event Date:03/17/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/28/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/23/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/18/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/16/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRandall E. Cash N
Thomas G. Ross YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
John M. Seabright YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CASH, RANDALL E. UNITED STATES
03/17/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS G. ROSS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 032787 SCHPRD CHECK
05/19/1987RECORD ON APPEAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 051887 SCHPRD R
05/26/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 060587 SCHPRD DSA
05/26/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 051887 SCHPRD DSA
06/01/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (116 PGS - SALAZAR) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S CORRECTED DOCKET- ING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 080787 SCHPRD BA
08/25/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR, APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072287 SCHPRD OPE
11/23/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/30/87 PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1987FiledRecord Completed
12/28/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (52 PGS - TREMEL) JB PANEL SCDATE 102087 SCHPRD RT
01/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/20/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 3RD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO ONLY TO EXTENT THAT APLT BR DUE IN 10 DAYS- ABSOLUTELY NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 121487 SCHPRD EBP
02/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF ONE DAY LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 021588 SCHPRD BA
02/17/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FILE BRF; CLK TO FILE BRF; APLE'S BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 030488 SCHPRD N
03/23/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/23/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD BE
07/18/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/18/1988SUBMITTED PANELMKRGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELMKRGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
09/16/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD