judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN HARRIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0199
Short Caption:JOHN HARRIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8512-85Filed Date:02/27/1987

Opening Event Date:02/27/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Harris N
Richard A. SeligmanNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARRIS, JOHN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 OF COUNSELS' AFFIDAVITS MLR NOTE - 01
02/27/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD SELIGMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD DSA
04/29/1987RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 042887 SCHPRD R
07/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (23 PGS. - RUST) PM PANEL SCDATE 050187 SCHPRD RT
07/13/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (7 PGS. - SWAGERTY) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(8 PGS.- OLIVER) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (7 PGS. - PIRFO) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (18 PGS. - VAN BREMEN) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (20 PGS - OLVIER) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) OF (RICHARD SELIGMAN) AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/23/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO DOCKET APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1988RECEIVED ATTACHMENT FROM APPELLANT TO ATTACH TO MOTION TO DOCKET AP- PEAL MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1989LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT, RESPONSE DUE BY 2/17/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 011289 SCHPRD X
02/23/1989RECEIVED MOTION OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO 10 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT(NOTE 1) PANEL SCDATE 021789 SCHPRD ANSA
03/15/1989ORDER GRANT PRO SE REQ OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL RESP TO MO TO W/D BY 4/3/89. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 022889 SCHPRD X
04/14/1989RECEIVED LETTER DATED 4/9/89, FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1989AFFIRMED JMT ON APPEAL & GRT MO OF COUN SEL TO WITHDRAW. PB PB PANELMKBEST SCDATE 030589 SCHPRD RT
08/31/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE