judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NORMAN ELLIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0195
Short Caption:NORMAN ELLIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7530-86Filed Date:02/26/1987

Opening Event Date:02/26/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/28/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/25/1991
Argued/Submitted:09/10/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/15/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNorman Ellis N
Betty M. Ballester YN
AppellantNorman Ellis N
Betty M. Ballester YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Thomas C. Black YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ELLIS, NORMAN UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 092487 ORDER: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 01 IN 10 DAYS TO FILE BR OR HIS NOTE - 02 APPOINTMNT WILL BE VACATED & NOTE - 02 THIS MATTER REFERRED TO BPR. NOTE - 03 6/1/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 03 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 04 OF CHARLES STOW III & APPT NOTE - 04 BETTY M. HUNTER FOR APLT; BRF NOTE - 05 OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 080588 ORDER: DENY APLT MO FOR NOTE - 06 AN ORDER REQ ADDITIONAL RT NOTE - 07 W/OUT PREJUDICE TO ITS RENEWAL NOTE - 07 BEFORE THE TR CRT FOR ITS CONS NOTE - 08 IN THE 1ST INSTANCE; FO: GRANT NOTE - 08 APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR NOTE - 09 ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT COUNSL NOTE - 09 FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO TAKE NOTE - 10 STEPS TO ORDER SUP RT & FILE NOTE - 10 A STATE W/THIS CRT INDICATING NOTE - 11 SUCH W/IN THAT SAME TIME. NOTE - 11 NOTE - 12 2/14/89 ORDER DENIED APLT MO NOTE - 12 TO HOLD APEAL IN ABEYANCE NOTE - 13 W/OUT PREJUDICE TO ITS RENEWAL NOTE - 13 UPON FILING 23-110 MO IN SP NOTE - 14 CT AND BRF OF APLT SHALL BE FL NOTE - 14 WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE NOTE - 15 OF THIS ORDER. NOTE - 15 NOTE - 16 4/13/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 16 STAY AND ALL PROCEEDINGS IN NOTE - 17 THIS APPEAL ARE STAYED PDG NOTE - 17 DISP OF MO. PURSUANT TO D.C. NOTE - 18 CODE 23-110 FILED IN TRIAL CT NOTE - 18 AND CNSL FOR APLT W/I 5 DAYS NOTE - 19 TO SERVE COPY OF SAID MO. UPON NOTE - 19 CLK OF THIS CT. FO THAT CNSL NOTE - 20 FOR APLT W/I 30 DAYS TO ADVISE NOTE - 20 THIS CT RE STATUS OF 23-110 NOTE - 21 MOTION. FAILURE OF CNSL TO NOTE - 21 NOTIFY THIS CT W/I 5 DAYS AFTR NOTE - 22 RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF DISP WILL NOTE - 22 BE CONSIDERED NON-COMPLIANCE NOTE - 23 WITH THE GEN. RULES OF THIS CT NOTE - 23 AND MAY RESULT IN CNSL'S NAME NOTE - 24 BEING REMOVED FROM THE PANEL NOTE - 24 OF ATTYS TO RECV APPTMTS IN NOTE - 25 PROCEEDINGS COVERED BY THE NOTE - 25 CRIM. JUSTICE ACT. NOTE - 26 12/12/89 ORD: OR NAME TO BE NOTE - 26 REMOVED FROM CJA PANEL OF ATTY NOTE - 27 AND MATTER SHALL BE REFERRED NOTE - 27 TO BPR FOR ITS CONSIDERATION. NOTE - 28 04/30/90 ORD: ORDER OR HIS NOTE - 28 APTMT WILL BE VACATED & NAME NOTE - 29 REMOVED FROM PANEL OF ATTYS TO NOTE - 29 RECEIVE APTMS UNDER CJA.
01/01/1906 STOWC VACATED 6/1/88.
02/26/1987NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CHARLES F. STOW, III, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD R
05/14/1987ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATE DUE IN 10 DAYS; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS EBP PANELPY SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD DSA
06/04/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: FAILURE TO FILE DSA-SEE 5/14/87 ORDER. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 052587 SCHPRD DSA
06/15/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO JUNE 4TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 061587 SCHPRD STATE
06/23/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1987ORDER CLK IS DIR TO FILE THE LDGD DSA; APLT'S BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. TTC PANELPY SCDATE 062587 SCHPRD CHECK
08/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (76 PGS - RONAN) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/26/1987RECORD COMPLETED
09/24/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD BA
10/05/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO SEPTEMBER 24TH COURT ORDER REGARDING FILING APPELLANT'S BRIEF OR VACATE APPT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/14/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD BA
11/10/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(113 PGS. -- SWAGERTY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD RT
02/02/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 20TH JB PANEL SCDATE 122187 SCHPRD BA
02/25/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 26, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1988ORDER GRANTING APLT'S MOTION FOR EXT TO FILE BRF TO 3/26/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 031588 SCHPRD V
04/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 21, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 032688 SCHPRD BA
05/13/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF ONLY TO THE EXT THAT BRF IS TO BE FL BY 5/20/88-ANFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 051088 SCHPRD V
05/23/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS TO APT. NEW COUNSEL & TO EXT. TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL NEW COUNSEL IS APPOINTED RJG PANEL SCDATE 051088 SCHPRD BA
06/01/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BETTY M. HUNTER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03-05. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 052588 SCHPRD G
07/11/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR AN ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL TRANS- CRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/5/88 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD BA
08/05/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06 - 11. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072788 SCHPRD M
09/20/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS -ABSO -NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD STATE
09/30/1988MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF APLT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME DUE TO A REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TRANSCRIPT GT PANEL SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD BA
11/08/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 40 DAYS AFTER RT. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD M
11/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(14 PGS/ WATKINS) AD PANEL SCDATE 111588 SCHPRD RT
11/23/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(46 PGS/SWAGERTY) AD PANEL SCDATE 120188 SCHPRD RT
11/28/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988RECORD COMPLETED
01/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF APPELLATE PROCEEDINGS GT PANEL SCDATE 010989 SCHPRD BA
02/14/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 12-15 PB PANELRO SCDATE 013189 SCHPRD N
03/20/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPELLATE PROCEEDINGS RJG PANEL SCDATE 031689 SCHPRD BA
04/13/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 16 THRU 25 SL PANELRO SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD N
04/24/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION (COURT'S ORDER 4-19-89) AD PANEL SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD STATE
09/01/1989ORDER SS, APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FL STATEMENT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MO PENDING IN TRIAL CRT. ACG PANELDDW SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD CHECK
09/28/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT STATUS REPORT REGARDING NEW TRIAL JB PANEL SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD STATE
09/28/1989STATEMENT APLT'S STATUS OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL AD PANEL SCDATE 092989 SCHPRD CHECK
11/15/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, ON OR BEF 11/27/89, TO FL STMT RE STATUS OF MOT IN TR CT. FVH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 5 DAYS, TO COMPLY WITH 11/15/89 ORD, (SEE NOTE FIELDS 26&27)FH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1989STATEMENT OF APLT RE 23-110 MOTION IN TRAIL COURT AJ PANEL SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD STATE
03/15/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 30 DAYS TO FILE STMT RE STATUS OF PENDING 23-110 MOTION. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/30/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 5 DAYS, TO COMPLY WITH 3/15/90 (SEE NOTE FIELDS 28 & 29) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1990APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AD PANEL SCDATE 050790 SCHPRD ANSA
06/11/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE STMT W/IN 10 DAYS RE STATUS OF PENDING MOT IN TR CT. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1990STATEMENT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL AD PANEL SCDATE 062190 SCHPRD STATE
08/17/1990ORDER CNSL FOR APLT TO FL STATE IN 30 AS TO STATUS OF PENDG MO IN TRL CRT. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081390 SCHPRD K
10/30/1990ORDER COUNS FOR APLT TO ADVISE THIS CRT W/IN 10 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDING MO IN TRL CRT. GW PANELRO SCDATE 102290 SCHPRD V
11/05/1990APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE STATUS OF MO FOR NEW TRIAL AD PANEL SCDATE 110990 SCHPRD ANSA
12/03/1990STATEMENT OF APLT STATUS OF MO FOR NEW TRIAL AD PANEL SCDATE 120190 SCHPRD CHECK
01/14/1991ORDER CNSL FOR APLT TO FL STATE IN 30 AS TO STATUS OF 23-110 MO FL IN THE TRL CRT. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 121190 SCHPRD V
03/11/1991STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/25/1991ORDER COUNS FOR APLT TO FL A STMNT W/THIS CRT IN 30 DAY OF STATUS OF PENDG MO FL IN TRL CRT. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 032191 SCHPRD CHECK
04/17/1991STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 042491 SCHPRD ANSA
05/07/1991ORDER DIR APLT TO ADVISE CT W/IN 30 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PEDNING MOTION IS TRIAL CT. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 043091 SCHPRD TO
05/15/1991STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING THE STATUS OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 060691 SCHPRD ANSA
07/18/1991ORDER BA DUE 8/21/91, BE DUE 9/20/91 RBA DUE 10/9/91. DEC CALENDAR. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1991STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING THE TRANSCRIPT & A MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/28/1991ORDER GR MO OF APLT EXT TM FL BRF TO 10 DAYS, BE DUE 10/3/91, RBA DUE 10/22/91. DEC CAL.AD PANELRBH SCDATE 090391 SCHPRD CHECK
09/17/1991ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BRF W/I N 5 DAYS OR VACATE CJA APPT. AD PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/20/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 092491 SCHPRD BA
10/04/1991ORDER THIS CT'S 7/18/91 BRFING ORDER IS VACATED, APLE'S BRF DUE ON OR BEFORE 10/25/91 JB PANELRO SCDATE 100391 SCHPRD BE
10/25/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 102591 SCHPRD BE
10/25/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
09/10/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/10/1992SUBMITTED (TE WG SU)
09/17/1992AFFIRMED MOJ (TE WG SU)
10/15/1992MANDATE ISSUED