judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHIRLEY J. HALL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0271
Short Caption:SHIRLEY J. HALL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4943-86Filed Date:03/13/1987

Opening Event Date:03/13/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/31/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/22/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/09/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/07/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantShirley J. Hall N
Walter S. BoothYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Gregory E. Jackson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HALL, SHIRLEY J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 11/25/87 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 FOR STAY & CASE STAYED PENDG NOTE - 02 TRL MO; APLT TO INFORM THIS NOTE - 02 CRT IN 30 DAYS OF STATUS OF MO
03/13/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WALTER S. BOOTH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD DSA
06/04/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 051287 SCHPRD R
08/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (141 PGS - SIMMS) PB PANEL SCDATE 052287 SCHPRD RT
08/31/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/31/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 101287 SCHPRD BA
09/18/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (56 PGS - KACZOROWSKI) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR, APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092187 SCHPRD OPE
10/19/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY PENDING 23-110 MOTION PENDING IN SUPERIOR COURT PB PANEL SCDATE 110187 SCHPRD BA
11/25/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 AND 02. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD CHECK
12/14/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING STAY PENDING IN TRIAL COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/18/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN TRIAL COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 122887 SCHPRD CHECK
02/23/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING OF STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION IN SUPERIOR COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD STATE
03/30/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 022488 SCHPRD M
04/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (33 PGS - BURNS) JB PANEL SCDATE 033188 SCHPRD RT
04/08/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 051888 SCHPRD BA
05/24/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 16TH JB PB PANEL SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD BE
06/16/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/22/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/09/1988SUBMITTED PANELNWBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -BE CITE 559 A.2d 1321
06/16/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - BE PAGE # - 1273
07/07/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD