judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JACKSON T. ELLERBE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0064
Short Caption:JACKSON T. ELLERBE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F079-82Filed Date:01/16/1987

Opening Event Date:01/16/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/13/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/09/1987
Argued/Submitted:05/02/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/03/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJackson T. Ellerbe N
Barbara R. Miller YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia A. Riley YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ELLERBE, JACKSON T. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 5/28/87 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 TO SUPP RECORD; CLK OF SUPER NOTE - 02 CRT TO TRANSMIT TRANSCRIPT NOTE - 02 SPECIFIED IN APLT'S MO AS A NOTE - 03 SUPP RECORD FORTHWITH. NOTE - 03
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/05/02 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MILLERB FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - RILEYPA FOR - APPELLEE
01/16/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/13/1987FiledRecord Completed
03/13/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 031787 SCHPRD R
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BARBARA R. MILLER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD DSA
04/30/1987APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/28/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 051287 SCHPRD OPE
06/26/1987ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 14, 1987 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 080687 SCHPRD BA
09/14/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 14TH JB PANEL SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD BA
09/21/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/01/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (567 PGS RT-CHASNEY/REMOVED FROM PRIOR APPEAL-CLERK'S FILE #83-45) MLH PANEL SCDATE 062987 SCHPRD SR
10/05/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 19TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL LODGED BA; BRF OF APLE DUE BY 11/19/87.DS PANELPY SCDATE 092387 SCHPRD OPE
11/20/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DEC. 1ST MLH PANEL SCDATE 111987 SCHPRD BE
12/01/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1987FiledBriefing Completed
12/09/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (21 PGS - DAVIS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/01/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1988LETTER LTR GRANTING REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 5/2/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 041388 SCHPRD OPE
05/02/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/02/1988ARGUED PANELPYRGST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/13/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL (PRINTED OP FILED 7/13/88) PANELPYRGST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/13/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE 545 A.2d 1197 (PRINTED OP FILED 7/13/88)
05/13/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 0872 -L
06/03/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/03/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLEE'S TO PUBLISH OPINION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO PUBLISH & CLK TO CAUSE DECISION TO BE PUBLISHED. DAS PANELPYROST SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD VS
08/01/1988NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN SUPREME COURT ON 7/21/88 (#88-5376); DENIED ON 10/3/88 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD