judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HERBERT AUSTIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0614
Short Caption:HERBERT AUSTIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 88-CF-0536 Consolidated: 88-CF-0568 , 88-CF-0614
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14291-87Filed Date:05/23/1988

Opening Event Date:05/23/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/12/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/04/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/28/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/16/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHerbert Austin N
Elizabeth G. Taylor YN
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Norman C. Bay YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901AUSTIN, HERBERT UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 88-536 & 88-568 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 BRIEF OF APLT IN NO. 88-614 IS NOTE - 02 FILED. FO THAT BRIEF OF APELE NOTE - 03 SHALL BE FILED W/I 30 DAYS NOTE - 03 FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER.
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/11/28 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BAYN FOR - APPELLEE TRDATE- 90/11/28 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KIERSHS FOR - FIELDS ATTY 2 - TAYLORE FOR - AUSTIN ATTY 3 - GRAYD FOR - LUMPKIN
05/23/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/03/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 061388 SCHPRD DSA
06/10/1988STATEMENT RE: TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 072288 SCHPRD R
10/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(544 PGS/SWARINGER) AD PANEL SCDATE 102188 SCHPRD RT
12/01/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (1047 PGS RT - HART) (VOLUMES I & II) GT PANEL SCDATE 090288 SCHPRD RT
12/12/1988FiledRecord Completed
01/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE PENDING COMPLETION OF THE RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 011089 SCHPRD BA
01/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(707 PGS/SWARINGER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO EXTENT THAT BR IS DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 020289 SCHPRD M
03/17/1989ORDER SS CONS 88-614 88-536 & 88-568 APLTS BRS IN 88-536 & 88-614 DUE IN 40 DAYS; APLE 30 AFT. PANELRBH SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD RT
03/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 21, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 042689 SCHPRD BA
04/14/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (ORDER OF JUDGE WALTON 4/3/89) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL TRANSCRIPT IS COMPLETED GT PANEL SCDATE 042689 SCHPRD BA
04/24/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-5-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1989ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING APLT BR FOR PERIOD OF 40 DAYS AFTR TRANSC DOCKETED. FVH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 88-536 TO JUNE 15, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO IN 88-536 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/15/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 061989 SCHPRD OPE
06/14/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO HOLD BRIEFING IN ABEYANCE FOR 40 DAYS TO JULY 25TH IN 88-536 JB PANEL SCDATE 061589 SCHPRD BA
07/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(150 PGS/SWARINGER) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD CHECK
07/20/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT IN 88-536 TO EXTENT BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 062689 SCHPRD OPE
08/16/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-536 RJG PANEL SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD BA
01/08/1990ORDER APLT'S BR TO BE FLD W/IN 20 DAYS; APLE'S BR TO BE FILED W/IN 30 DAYS THEREAFTR. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 28,1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD BA
02/12/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 2/28/90. NFX FVH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 20 DAYS AD PANEL SCDATE 022890 SCHPRD BA
03/20/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO AN EXT TM TO FL BRIEF IN 88-614 AND LODGED SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 3 JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 031990 SCHPRD B
05/04/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-4-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 050490 SCHPRD BE
05/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6(ORDER JUDGE CUSHENBERRY DATED 5-1-90) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/29/1990ORDER GRT APLE'S MO X TM TO FL BRIEF TO 6/4/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 052390 SCHPRD B
05/31/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7(5 PGS/SWARINGER) PF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/04/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/04/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD BE
10/16/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO FL LODGED REPLY BRF. CT PANELRBH SCDATE 012690 SCHPRD CHECK
10/23/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF CT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1990ORDER GRANT MOT OF APLT IN 88-568 TO POSTPONE; CASES REMOVED FR 11/6 REG CAL; RESCHE ASAP. MH PANELROFETY SCDATE 110690 SCHPRD CREG
11/16/1990ORDER SUA SPONTE ORDER SCHEDULING CASE FOR ARGUMENT 11/28 AT 3:00 PM. PANELRBH SCDATE 111590 SCHPRD CHECK
11/28/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/28/1990ARGUED PANELRGFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1991AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART JUDGMENT AF IN PART JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION/CAUSE RM w/ INSTRUCTIONS SET FORTH IN OP. PANELRGFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRM METH -OPN JUDGE -FE CITE
01/31/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 0366 OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 0000 (CC/DS IN PART)
02/14/1991APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING FOR AN ADDITIONAL 14 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1991ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET AND PET FOR REH/REH EB DUE W/I 14 DAYS FM DATE OF ORD SL PANELRO SCDATE 022691 SCHPRD OPE
02/27/1991MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC FOR 14 DAYS (APLT) AD PANEL SCDATE 030791 SCHPRD MRRB
03/01/1991ORDER GRT APLT'S PRO SE MO. AND THE PET FOR REH EB SHALL BE FILED ON 3/13/91 (ABSOLUTELY NFX) SL PANELRO SCDATE 031191 SCHPRD OPE
03/11/1991PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/16/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1991NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIIN U.S. SUPREME COURT ON 6/10/91 #90-8409 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD Denied