judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DERWIN B. STRAITE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0510
Short Caption:DERWIN B. STRAITE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Lead: 88-CF-0194 Consolidated: 88-CF-0424 , 88-CF-0510
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5565-87Filed Date:05/04/1988

Opening Event Date:05/04/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/17/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/09/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/08/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/25/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDerwin B. Straite N
Steven R. KiershYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Ann K. H. SimonYN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STRAITE, DERWIN B. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: MICHAEL PERRY NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 CON 88-194 & 88-424 NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 10/13/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 03 IN 88-194 & 88-424 TO REMOVE NOTE - 04 THEM FROM REG CAL OF 11/8/89 & NOTE - 04 CLK TO RESCHED AS SOON AS THE NOTE - 05 CAL PERMITS. NOTE - 05
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/11/08 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KIERSHS FOR - APLT STRAITE ATTY 2 - VAN SUSTERENG FOR - APLT PERRY ATTY 3 - SIMONA FOR - APPELLEE
05/04/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/20/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN R. KIERSH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 053188 SCHPRD DSA
07/05/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 070588 SCHPRD R
07/22/1988ORDER SS, CONS 88-510 W/88-194 & 88- 424; APLTS BRS DUE 40 DAYS AFT RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (2,016 PGS - RHOADES) JB PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD RT
08/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (640 PGS RT - RHOADES) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/16/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT IN 88-194 & 88-424 FOR BRIEFING ORDER MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1989FiledRecord Completed
01/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(63 PGS/CARTER) AD PANEL SCDATE 071588 SCHPRD RT
01/19/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO SET BR SCHED, APLT BR IN 88-184 & 88-424 DUE IN 40 DAYS,CON APLE BR 30 AFT. PANELRBH SCDATE 071588 SCHPRD RT
01/25/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-424 & 88-194 AD PANEL SCDATE 022889 SCHPRD BA
02/27/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/31/89 (NO OPA) MLR PANEL SCDATE 030189 SCHPRD BE
03/22/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 3/31/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD OPA
03/31/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/1/89 PANEL SCDATE 033189 SCHPRD BE
04/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(59 PGS/CARTER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/1/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 041289 SCHPRD OPA
05/01/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/1/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD BE
06/01/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 2ND JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/02/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1989FiledBriefing Completed
06/09/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLE IS FL; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 051189 SCHPRD OPA
10/02/1989MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD (APPELLEE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1989MOTION TO SUBMIT WITHOUT ARGUMENT OF APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO POSTPONE/CONTINUE ARGUMENT IN 88-194 & 88-424 (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO SUPP REC & CLK OF SUPER CRT TO FL EXH. 57 & 66 TO THIS CRT AS SUPP REC. PANELRBH SCDATE 101189 SCHPRD OPA
10/13/1989ORDER DENY MO OF APLT TO SUBMIT & CASE SHALL REMAIN SCHED ON 11/8/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03-05. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1989ORDER VACATE 10/13/89 ORD TO EXTENT THIS CASE REMOVED FROM CAL OF 11/8/89; CLK TO RESCHED. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 110889 SCHPRD CREG
10/26/1989ORDER SUA SPONTE THAT THIS APPEAL IS RESCHD FOR ARGUMENT ON THE REG CALDR OF 11/8/89 AT 9:30 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 101889 SCHPRD READY
11/08/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/08/1989ARGUED PANELBESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1990AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELBESTKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -KN CITE 571 A.2d 1156
03/14/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - KN PAGE # - 0674
06/25/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD