judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TANYA GREGORY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0521
Short Caption:TANYA GREGORY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SP946-88Filed Date:05/11/1988

Opening Event Date:05/11/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/03/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTanya Gregory N
Edward R. Shannon NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GREGORY, TANYA AKA TANYA KHAN UNITED STATES
05/11/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/11/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S EXPEDITED APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1988RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL WITH 4 PGS.-- JOYNER RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1988APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 053188 SCHPRD OPA
05/27/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO WAIVE AND STAY THE EXPEDITED APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/02/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/02/1988APPEARANCE OF EDWARD C. BOU & STEPHEN A. BOU AS RETAINED COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/02/1988ORDER GRANT MO TO DISMISS & DISMISS APPEAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTIN ACG PANELBETE SCDATE 053188 SCHPRD VS
06/02/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
06/03/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE APPEAL ISSUANCE OF MANDATE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/03/1988ORDER GRANT MO TO EXPEDITE ISSUANCE OF MANDATE & CLERK TO ISSUE MANDATE FORTHWITH. ACG PANELPY SCDATE 061488 SCHPRD OPE