judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PAULETTE BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0576
Short Caption:PAULETTE BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 88-CF-0525 Consolidated:88-CF-0576
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7296-87Filed Date:05/10/1988

Opening Event Date:05/10/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/29/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPaulette Brown N
Timothy B. Walthall NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWN, PAULETTE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 3/30/89 ORD: GRANT MO TO CONS NOTE - 01 88-525 & 88-576; FLNG OF APLES NOTE - 02 BRF IN 88-525 SHALL BE STAYED NOTE - 02 PENDG FURTHER ORD OF CRT. NOTE - 03 CON 88-525 (JMT AF 11/8/89) NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 110789 JUDG: GRANT MO TO WITH- NOTE - 04 DRAW OF APLT; APLT'S REQUEST NOTE - 05 TO APPOINT NEW COUNSEL DENIED; NOTE - 05 JUDGMENT ON APPEAL DENIED.
05/10/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/27/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) TIMOTHY B. WALTHALL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD DSA
07/12/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD R
07/14/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 23, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD BA
09/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (397 PGS - FINNERIN) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 10/3/88. PB PANELPY SCDATE 091588 SCHPRD V
09/27/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 25 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD BA
10/07/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO EXTENT THAT BR IS DUE 40 DAYS AFT RT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092988 SCHPRD M
11/23/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) (APPELLANT) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1988LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT, RESPONSE DUE BY 1/12/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 120688 SCHPRD X
01/18/1989RECEIVED ANSWER OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, TO MOTION OF COUNSEL TO WITH- DRAW MLR PANEL SCDATE 011289 SCHPRD ANSA
02/15/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 88-525 AND TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 88-525 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 & 02. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD Q
11/07/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/07/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-05. MEH PANELNWFEST SCDATE 112889 SCHPRD RT
11/07/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
11/29/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD