judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES M. KEA V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0575
Short Caption:CHARLES M. KEA V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:88-CF-0575Consolidated: 88-CM-0635
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5417-85Filed Date:05/10/1988

Opening Event Date:05/10/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles M. Kea N
Lawrence M. Baskir NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KEA, CHARLES M. AKA LENDELL CHRISTIE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 6/24/88 ORD: SS, CONS 88-575 & NOTE - 01 88-635; LAWRENCE BASKIR APPTD NOTE - 02 FOR APLT IN 88-635; APLT IN NOTE - 02 88-635 TO FL DSA IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 03 CON 88-635 NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 3/23/89 ORD: THAT COURT-APPTD NOTE - 04 CNSL SHALL SHOW CAUSE W/I 10 NOTE - 05 DAYS WHY THESE APPEALS SHLD NOTE - 05 NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF NOTE - 06 JURISDICTION AS UNTIMELY FLD. NOTE - 06 FO THAT THE MO. TO WITHDRAW AS NOTE - 07 CNSL IS HELD IN ABEYANCE PDG NOTE - 07 A RESPONSE TO THIS ORDER.
05/10/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/27/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LAWRENCE M. BASKIR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD DSA
06/24/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 AND 02 DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN #88-635 GT PANEL SCDATE 070888 SCHPRD DSA
07/07/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD R
07/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD BA
08/11/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO STAY ONLY TO EXTENT BRF OF APLT DUE BY 9/2/88; ANFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD CHECK
09/20/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW GT PANEL SCDATE 092088 SCHPRD BA
09/28/1988LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT, RESPONSE DUE BY 10/28/88. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 4 THRU 7 SL PANELMK SCDATE 110388 SCHPRD TMC
04/03/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO MARCH 23TH ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY APPEAL SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED JB PANEL SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD ANSA
10/20/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
10/20/1989ORDER GRANT MOTION TO DISMISS & DISMISS APPEAL. MEH PANELSCMK SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD VS
10/20/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
11/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD