judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIE E. LUCHIE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0571
Short Caption:WILLIE E. LUCHIE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:88-CF-0571Consolidated: 90-CO-0277
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10748-86Filed Date:05/17/1988

Opening Event Date:05/17/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/18/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/04/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/22/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/29/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWillie Luchi N
Mindy A. DanielsYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Carolyn K. Kolben YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LUCHIE, WILLIE E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/21/88 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 01 STAY BRFG SCHD AND ALL PROC. NOTE - 02 ARE STAYED PDG DISP. OF 23-110 NOTE - 02 MO. FILED IN TRIAL CT. FO THAT NOTE - 03 CNSL FOR APLT W/I 30 DAYS TO NOTE - 03 ADVISE THIS CT. RE STATUS OF NOTE - 04 23-110 MOTION. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 03/27/90 ORD: DANIELS, ESQ. NOTE - 05 APPTD TO REPT APLT IN 90-277; NOTE - 06 DSA IN 90-277 SHALL BE FLD W/ NOTE - 06 IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 07 CON: 90-277 NOTE - 07
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/01/22 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - DANIELSM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - KOLBENC FOR - APPELLEE
05/17/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/03/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MINDY A. DANIELS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 061388 SCHPRD DSA
07/27/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (718 PGS RT - WHALEN) GT PANEL SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD R
09/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 5TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD BA
10/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 4TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 100588 SCHPRD BA
10/28/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 11/4/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD CHECK
11/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL PENDING DISPOSITION OF 23-110 MOTION IN TRIAL COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 110488 SCHPRD BA
12/21/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 4 SL PANELRO SCDATE 112388 SCHPRD N
01/19/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE ORDER 12-21-88 AD PANEL SCDATE 012089 SCHPRD ANSA
02/08/1989ORDER APLT W/IN 10 DAYS TO FL STATE AS TO STATUS OF MO PENDING IN TRIAL COURT. PANELRBH SCDATE 020289 SCHPRD M
02/15/1989STATEMENT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION IN TRIAL COURT AD PANEL SCDATE 022089 SCHPRD STATE
04/21/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE A STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN TRIAL COURT. (23-110) EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 040189 SCHPRD CHECK
04/28/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT TO ORDER 4/21/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD STATE
06/20/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STMT RE STATUS OF PENDING MOT IN TR. CT. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/12/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO FILE STATEMENT TWO DAYS OUT OF TIME AD MEH PANEL SCDATE 071189 SCHPRD STATE
07/12/1989RECEIVED STATE PURSUANT TO COURT'S ORDER OF 6-20-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1989STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 072689 SCHPRD M
10/30/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT W/IN 10 DAYS SHALL ADVISE THIS CT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION JB PANEL SCDATE 100189 SCHPRD CHECK
11/06/1989STATEMENT TO 23-110 MOTION AD PANEL SCDATE 110989 SCHPRD STATE
12/08/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, ON OR BEF 1/7/90, TO FILE STMT RE STATUS OF 23- 110 MOT IN TRIAL CT. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1990STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION IN TRIAL COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 010790 SCHPRD STATE
02/26/1990STATEMENT OF APLT STATEMENT DISPOSITION 23-110 MOTION AJ PANEL SCDATE 030190 SCHPRD CHECK
03/27/1990ORDER SS CONSOLIDATING 88-571 & 90-277 FOR ALL PURP; FO MINDY (SEE NOTE FIELDS 5-6) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN NO. 90-277 CWC PANEL SCDATE 040690 SCHPRD DSA
04/17/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(159 PGS/GOAD) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1990RECORD COMPLETED
05/30/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE W/90-277 AND TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BA TO 6-27-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 052990 SCHPRD BA
06/05/1990ORDER GRTG MOT TO EXT BA DUE BY 6/27/90; NFX FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/03/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/03/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FL LODGED BF & BF FLD. FO APLE BF BE FLD W/IN 30 DYS FRM DT OF ORD. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 072390 SCHPRD GR
07/31/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-20-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 082490 SCHPRD BE
08/10/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1990ORDER GRNT APPLT MO X TM TO FL LODGD BRF. FO APLE BF SHALL BE FLD W/IN 30 DYS FRM DT OF ORD. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 080190 SCHPRD GR
09/07/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-24-90 AD DAS PANEL SCDATE 091090 SCHPRD BE
09/24/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1990BRIEFS COMPLETED
10/04/1990error
10/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (32-PGS/BURNS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(17 PGS/SIMMS) IN 90-277 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO ADOPT 23-110 MOTION AS PART OF THE RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/22/1991ARGUED PANELRGFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT TO ADOPT 23- 110 MOT AS PART OF REC; CLERK OF SUP CT TO TRANS FORTHWITH. PANELROFEBE SCDATE 012291 SCHPRD VS
02/06/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(PER 1/30/91 ORDER) PANEL SCDATE 022591 SCHPRD SR
02/07/1991MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING SUP REC FILED PER 1/30/91 ORDER TO DIVISION. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1991ORDER DIRTG CLK OF SUP CT TO TRANSMT DEFENDANT SUSPECT STMT AS A SUPPL REC TO THIS CT FORTHWITH PANELROFEBE SCDATE 082191 SCHPRD VS
09/06/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (DEFENDANT SUSPECT STATEMENTS) PR PANEL SCDATE 100491 SCHPRD SR
10/24/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (SUSPECTS STATEMENT & ORD PER CURIAM DATED 9/5/91) RJG PANEL SCDATE 100491 SCHPRD SR
07/07/1992AFFIRMED Judgment AF judgment of conviction (RG FE BE)
07/29/1992MANDATE ISSUED