Case Information: 46622 | |||
Short Caption: | SIMMONS (RAYMOND) VS. DISTRICT COURT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 46493 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C199075 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/18/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/18/2006 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for a Writ of Mandamus/Prohibition with Appeal Pending. | 06-01214 | |
02/08/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP | 06-02789 | |
03/07/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 06-03915 | |
03/07/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/20/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On February 3, 2006, this court received a proper person motion for preliminary injunction. No good cause appearing, this court denies the motion. | 06-05851 | |
03/21/2006 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 02/08/06 and Notice in Lieu of Remittitur issued 03/07/06 addressed to Raymond Simmons returned. No forwarding address. | ||
03/31/2006 | Other | Returned Mail. Receipt for documents dated 02/03/06 addressed to Raymond Simmons returned. No forwarding address. | ||
04/04/2006 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 03/20/06 addressed to Raymond Simmons returned. No forwarding address. |