judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BOBBY E. HAZEL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0127
Short Caption:BOBBY E. HAZEL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Bail Reform Act
Lead:87-CF-0127Consolidated: 87-CF-0128
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3869-84Filed Date:

Opening Event Date:Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:11/14/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/24/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBobby E. Hazel N
W. Gary KohlmanNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kevin Ohlson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAZEL, BOBBY E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/22/87 ORD: DENY MO OF APLE NOTE - 01 TO DISMISS APPEAL; APLT TO FL NOTE - 02 DOCKETG STATE, D/R & SRT IN 10 NOTE - 02 DAYS OR CASE WILL BE DISMISSED NOTE - 03 CON 87-128 NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 091587 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 04 FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO THE NOTE - 05 EXTENT THAT COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 05 IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: NOTE - 06 STATUS OF RT, INDICATING NAME NOTE - 06 OF CT RPTR PREPARING THE RT, NOTE - 07 ESTIMATED # OF PAGES TO BE NOTE - 07 FILED & ESTIMATED COMPLETION NOTE - 08 DATE OF THE RT. NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 6/28/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 09 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 10 OF THOMAS K. CLANCY & CLK TO NOTE - 10 ENTER APPRNC OF W. GARY NOTE - 11 KOHLMAN FOR APLT; CONS BRF OF NOTE - 11 APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLET NOTE - 12 REC IS FL. NOTE - 12 NOTE - 13 10/13/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 13 TO STAY APPEAL & CASE STAYED NOTE - 14 PENDG F/O OF CRT; COUNSEL FOR NOTE - 14 APLT TO FL STATE IN 20 DAYS NOTE - 15 AS TO STATUS OF PENDG MO IN NOTE - 15 TRL CRT. NOTE - 16 03/12/90 ORD: FOR ALL PURP; NOTE - 16 FO APLT'S BR EXTENDED FOR A NOTE - 17 PERIOD OF 20 DAYS. NFX NOTE - 17 NOTE - 18 CON: 89-1160, 89-1239, NOTE - 18 89-1376
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/11/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KOHLMANW FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BUNNELLS FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 CLANCYT VACATED 6/28/88.
03/18/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) JB PANEL SCDATE 032387 SCHPRD R
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS K. CLANCY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD DSA
06/04/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (17 PGS - BURNS) PB PANEL SCDATE 041787 SCHPRD RT
06/10/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/18/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD BA
08/03/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (101 PGS. - RIZZA) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1987ORDER SS, CONS 87-127 & 87-128; CONS BR OF APLT DUE 9/7/87. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 063087 SCHPRD OPE
08/20/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 090787 SCHPRD BA
08/21/1987RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, RE NEW COUNSEL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 - 08. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD OPE
09/23/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE ORDER 9/15/87 MLH PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD STATE
09/24/1987LETTER TO APLT RE NEW COUNSEL SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD CHECK
03/04/1988$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/27/1988ORDER CT RPTR TO COMPLETE & FILE 1/21/87 RT BY 6/6/88 -ABSO-NFX EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1988APPEARANCE OF W. GARY KOHLMAN AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF THOMAS K. CLANCY AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (16 PGS. -- BURNEY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD RT
06/28/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 09-12. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 062488 SCHPRD X
07/01/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 7TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 080988 SCHPRD BA
08/17/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF OF APLT DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 081288 SCHPRD X
09/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL PENDING RESOLUTION OF NEW TRIAL MOTION JB PANEL SCDATE 091688 SCHPRD BA
10/13/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FILEDS 13-15. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 100788 SCHPRD Q
12/07/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO COMPLY W/10-13 ORD OR VACATE APPOINTMNT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD STATE
12/09/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE ORDER 12/7/88 MLR PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD STATE
02/02/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN TRIAL COURT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 010987 SCHPRD CHECK
02/07/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO FEBRUARY 2ND COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD STATE
04/07/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF MO IN TRIAL COURT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 030189 SCHPRD CHECK
04/13/1989STATEMENT OF APLT RE STATUS OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD STATE
06/16/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 20 DAYS, TO FILE STMT RE STATUS OF MOTION IN TRIAL COURT. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989STATEMENT OF APLT'S COUNSEL RE: STATUS OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL IN THE TRIAL COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 070789 SCHPRD STATE
09/11/1989ORDER APLT TO ADVISE COURT W/I 10 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF 23-110 MO IN TRIAL COURT. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 080289 SCHPRD U
09/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ORDER JUDGE SHUKER AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (JUDGE SHUKER'S ORDER DATED 9/8/89) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IN 87-128, 89-1160 AND 89-1239 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (SUPPLEMENTAL) THIS APPEAL W/ 87-128, 89-1160, 89-1239 89-1376 & 89-1387 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COURT RULES ON THE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1990LETTER RE CASE FROM APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1990ORDER CONSOLIDATING APPEALS 87-127, 87-128, 89-1160, 89-1239 & 89- 1376 (SEE NOTES 16-17) FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO (?) NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD BA
04/11/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR TO AND INC. 4/16/90. NFX FVH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1990LETTER FROM BOBBY HAZEL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 041690 SCHPRD BA
04/23/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1990ORDER APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FL LODGED BR GRANTD. APLE'S BR DUE IN 30 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORDER. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 051490 SCHPRD Q
06/15/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 061590 SCHPRD BE
10/04/1990LETTER FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL REQ. CASE TO BE HEARD FIRST ON THE CALENDAR RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S REQUEST TO ALLOW ARGUMENT TO START AT 8:30 AM ON 11/14/90. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 100990 SCHPRD VS
10/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/29/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT TO LATE FL REPLY BRF. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 101890 SCHPRD VS
10/29/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 102990 SCHPRD OPE
11/02/1990CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/14/1990ARGUED PANELSTSCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1990CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 OF APLE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (21-PGS/MOLLICHELLI) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1991APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1991RECEIVED APLT'S REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELSTSCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE 599 A.2d 38
10/31/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 3383
11/14/1991APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING TO DECEMBER 2, 1991 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1991ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET AND PET FOR REHRG DUE ON OR BEFORE 12/2/91 SL PANELRO SCDATE 112591 SCHPRD CHECK
12/02/1991PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 120291 SCHPRD MRHA
01/24/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1992NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIin U.S. Supreme Court dated 4/15/92 #91-8503.
10/22/1992COPY OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI file in supreme court
04/18/2000MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE Denied
04/28/2000On consideraton of pro se appellant's motion to recall the mandate, it is ORDERED that appellee shall, within 30 days from the date of this order file a response to appellant's motion to recall the mandate. It is F/ORDERED that appellant's motion to recall the mandate is hereby held in abeyance pending receipt of appellee's response. (BY: WASTSC)
05/26/2000APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE until 6/13.
06/08/2000On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time to file a response to appellant's motion to recall the mandate, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellee's response to the motion to recall the mandate shall be filed on or before June 13, 2000. (WASTSC)
06/13/2000APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to aplt's mot to re-call the mandate
06/26/2000APPELLANT'S REPLY to appellee's opposition to the motion to recall mandate
07/26/2000TMC - Aplt's motion to recall the mandate - Aple's opposition - Aplt's reply
07/27/2000ORD DENYING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE (by: WGSTSC)