judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDRE GRAY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0116
Short Caption:ANDRE GRAY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7799-86Filed Date:01/29/1987

Opening Event Date:01/29/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/23/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/24/1987
Argued/Submitted:04/05/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/17/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAndre Gray N
Thomas T. HeslepYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia A. Riley YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GRAY, ANDRE a/k/a Curtis Brown UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 110387 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 01 FOR RT, CLK OF SUP CT TO PRE- NOTE - 02 PARE & TRANSMIT THE RT AS A NOTE - 02 SUP RECORD FORTHWITH; FO: APLE NOTE - 03 MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR IS GRANT NOTE - 03 ONLY TO EXTENT THAT APLE BR IS NOTE - 04 DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED NOTE - 04 WITH THIS COURT.
01/29/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/23/1987FiledRecord Completed
03/23/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 033187 SCHPRD R
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS T. HESLEP, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DOCKETING STATE OF APLT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD DSA
05/11/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH 4/22 ORDER. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 050487 SCHPRD DSA
05/28/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/28/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S RESPONSE TO MAY 11TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 052187 SCHPRD STATE
05/29/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE TO MAY 11TH COURT ORDER OUT OF TIME JB PANEL SCDATE 060187 SCHPRD CHECK
07/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (242 PGS. - RAMOS) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 5/11/87 ORDER SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1987ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FILE RESPONSE & DKTG STMT; APLT'S BRIEF DUE IN 40 DAYS SL PANELPY SCDATE 060887 SCHPRD CHECK
08/03/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR SUPPLEMENTAL TRANSCRIPTS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD BA
10/05/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 5TH JB PANEL SCDATE 100687 SCHPRD BE
10/26/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (48 PGS - RAMOS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELFEST SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD VS
11/06/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF TIME HAVING EXPIRED JB DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/24/1987FiledBriefing Completed
11/24/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (15 PGS. -- RAMOS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 010888 SCHPRD RT
04/05/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/05/1988SUBMITTED PANELPYTEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (12 PGS - WRAY) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1988REVERSED AND REMANDED JDGMT RV JDGMT OF CONVICTION/ CAUSE RM FOR NEW TRIAL PANELPYTEGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 549 A.2d 347
10/27/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 2262
11/17/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD