judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES M. JACKSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0577
Short Caption:JAMES M. JACKSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6615-86Filed Date:05/02/1988

Opening Event Date:05/02/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/06/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/23/1991
Argued/Submitted:02/20/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/07/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames M. Jackson N
Andrew J. DelehantyYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas J. Tourish, Jr.YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JACKSON, JAMES M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 10/23/91 ORD: APLE MO X TM NOTE - 01 FL LODGD BRF GRNTD & LODGED NOTE - 02 BRF FLD. CASE SCHEDULED FOR NOTE - 02 CONSIDERATION BEFORE MERITS NOTE - 03 DIVISION AS SOON AS BUSINESS NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 OF COURT PERMITS. NOTE - 04
05/02/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/27/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANDREW J.J. DELEHANTY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD DSA
06/28/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 070188 SCHPRD R
06/29/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/01/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BA
08/16/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 40 DAYS AFT RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080388 SCHPRD M
02/23/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL FOR COURT PAID INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1989ORDER DENY MO OF APLT FOR CRT APPTD INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES W/OUT PREJ TO RENEWAL IN TRL CRT. PANELMK SCDATE 031489 SCHPRD Q
07/06/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(344 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
07/06/1989RECORD COMPLETED
08/04/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR FORTY(40)DAYS FROM DUE DATE GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF BY 9/25/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD X
10/05/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-31-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 092589 SCHPRD BA
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/31/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 101189 SCHPRD M
10/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 103189 SCHPRD BA
12/04/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 111589 SCHPRD U
05/08/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(40 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 040890 SCHPRD RT
07/24/1991ORDER APLT BRF DUE W/IN 40 DYS FRM DT OF ORDER. APLE BRF DUE W/IN 30 DYS THEREAFTER. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 062891 SCHPRD U
09/03/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 090391 SCHPRD BA
10/03/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/17/91 AJ PANEL SCDATE 100391 SCHPRD BE
10/17/1991RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF GR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04 GR PANELRBH SCDATE 101891 SCHPRD GR
10/23/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/20/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/20/1992SUBMITTED PANELRGSCBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1992AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION (RG SC BE)
04/07/1992MANDATE ISSUED