judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MORRIS YARBOROUGH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0565
Short Caption:MORRIS YARBOROUGH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1627-87Filed Date:05/17/1988

Opening Event Date:05/17/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/07/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/28/1989
Argued/Submitted:04/19/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/11/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMorris Yarborough N
Joanne D. Slaight NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
William L. Peters YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
John W. Kern YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901YARBOROUGH, MORRIS AKA TURNER YARBOROUGH UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: STANLEY JACKSON NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 6/28/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 02 TO W/D & VACATE APPMT OF NOTE - 03 JOANNE SLAIGHT & APPT WILLIAM NOTE - 03 PETERS FOR APLT; APLT TO FL NOTE - 04 DSA IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 04
01/01/1906 SLAIGHTJ VACATED 6/28/88.
05/17/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/27/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOANNE D. SLAIGHT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF JOANNE SLAIGHT AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD DSA
06/28/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM L. PETERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD GG
07/08/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 070888 SCHPRD DSA
07/21/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD R
06/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (9 PGS. -- SCHERTZER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD RT
07/07/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/07/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (258 PGS - JACKSON) JB PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
08/14/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/23/89 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 081689 SCHPRD BA
08/23/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR EXT OF TIME TO FILE THE BRF TO 9/25/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 081689 SCHPRD V
09/25/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 092589 SCHPRD BA
10/26/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-29-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD BE
10/30/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/29/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 102789 SCHPRD V
11/28/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-28-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 112989 SCHPRD BE
12/27/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLE'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 12/28/89. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1989FiledBriefing Completed
12/28/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 122889 SCHPRD BE
04/19/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/19/1990SUBMITTED PANELBESCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/20/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELBESCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/20/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/11/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD