judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EARL J. JORDAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0562
Short Caption:EARL J. JORDAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F13606-87Filed Date:05/12/1988

Opening Event Date:05/12/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/11/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/07/1989
Argued/Submitted:04/03/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/04/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEarl J. Jordan N
David E. Jones YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Guizelous O. Molock YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JORDAN, EARL J. UNITED STATES
05/12/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/27/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID E. JONES, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD DSA
07/11/1988FiledRecord Completed
07/11/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (44 PGS RT SALAZAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD R
07/06/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (86 PGS. -- JANIFER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
08/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 45 DAYS FROM CURRENT FILE DATE OF 8/21/89 RJG PANEL SCDATE 081589 SCHPRD BA
08/25/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/14/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 082489 SCHPRD M
09/19/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 25, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 091489 SCHPRD BA
09/25/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD M
11/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 13, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 111189 SCHPRD BE
12/04/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1989FiledBriefing Completed
12/07/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 120689 SCHPRD K
04/03/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/03/1990SUBMITTED PANELTESTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1990AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART MOJ RM TO VA UUMV CONVICTION or TO CORRECT JUDGMENT...IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS JDGMT AF PANELTESTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRM METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/04/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD