judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARLOS A. REYES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0133
Short Caption:CARLOS A. REYES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3424-86Filed Date:01/20/1987

Opening Event Date:01/20/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/13/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/22/1989
Argued/Submitted:07/06/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/28/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarlos A. Reyes N
John C. Krollman YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901REYES, CARLOS A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 100287 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 01 FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO THE NOTE - 02 EXTENT THAT COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 02 W/IN 10 DAYS IS DIR TO FILE NOTE - 03 THE APPROPRIATE MO FOR PRODUC- NOTE - 03 TION OF RT W/THE CLK OF THE NOTE - 04 SUP CT & SERVE A COPY W/THIS NOTE - 04 CT. NOTE - 05 092988 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 05 FOR LV TO FILE RESPONSE TO NOTE - 06 8/5/88 ORDER; CLK TO FILE LDGD NOTE - 06 RESPONSE; FO: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 07 IN 10 DAYS TO PROPERLY ORDER NOTE - 07 RT & FILE STATE INDICATING NOTE - 08 SUCH W/THIS CT W/IN THAT SAME NOTE - 08 TIME, OR ALTERNATIVELY APLT BR NOTE - 09 DUE W/IN 40 DAYS FROM THE DATE NOTE - 09 OF THIS ORDER.
01/20/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/18/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 032387 SCHPRD R
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN KROLLMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DOCKETING STATE OF APLT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD DSA
05/01/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 050487 SCHPRD DSA
05/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (137 PGS - PIRFO) JB PANEL SCDATE 041687 SCHPRD RT
05/13/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/19/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 1ST (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD BA
07/01/1987ORDER GRT MO ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT THE APLT'S BR DUE IN 30 DAYS. TTC PANELPY SCDATE 070187 SCHPRD CHECK
07/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (98 PGS. - MOORE) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 31ST (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD BA
08/06/1987ORDER GRANT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF OF APLT TO 8/31/87; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD CHECK
09/08/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AFTER ADDITIONAL TRANSCRIPT IS FILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 083187 SCHPRD BA
10/02/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092087 SCHPRD OPE
10/06/1987RECEIVED APLT'S MOTION FOR TRANSCRIPT FILED IN SUPERIOR, PURSUANT TO OCTOBER 2ND ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 101287 SCHPRD STATE
03/07/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 10/31/86 RT FROM CT RPTR PIRFO. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 11/3/86 RT FROM CT RPTR FINNERIN. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 10/29 & 31/87 RT FROM CT RPTR PIRFO. (COMP & SUBMITTED TO COUNSEL 4/21/87) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1988ORDER SS, COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 15 DYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF RT EBP PANELPY SCDATE 110187 SCHPRD CHECK
08/23/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE TO ORDER 8/5/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD STATE
08/23/1988RECEIVED ANSWER TO ORDER 8/5/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 8/5/88 ORDER. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05 - 09. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 091588 SCHPRD M
11/18/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-28-88 AD PANEL SCDATE 110888 SCHPRD BA
12/09/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT BRF TO BE FL IN 10 DAYS. PB PANELRO SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD V
12/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF TIME HAVING EXPIRED JB PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD BA
12/20/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-23-89 ( NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1989MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD (APPELLEE) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/03/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/03/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO LV TO FL BRF, AND GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 2/23/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 011289 SCHPRD V
02/16/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO SUPP REC & CLK OF SUPER CRT TO TRANSMIT EXH 1D-1G AS SUPP REC. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 020989 SCHPRD Q
02/22/1989FiledBriefing Completed
02/22/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 022389 SCHPRD BE
02/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(ORDER/JUDGE ROGERS 2-16-89) PANEL SCDATE 031689 SCHPRD SR
07/06/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/06/1989SUBMITTED PANELFEBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/28/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD