Case: 04-91-00708-CV
04-91-00708-CV
12/19/1991
Other Personal Injury
Ruben Garcia
San Antonio Housing Authority; Et Al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/20/1993 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/20/1993 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/23/1993 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
06/23/1993 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
06/23/1993 | Opinion Withdrawn | | |
06/23/1993 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/23/1993 | Motion for Rehearing Granted | | |
06/23/1993 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
04/13/1993 | Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/13/1993 | Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/02/1993 | Information regarding cause received | | |
04/02/1993 | Information regarding cause received | | |
03/26/1993 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
03/26/1993 | Rehearing Received | | |
03/26/1993 | Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
03/26/1993 | Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
03/03/1993 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/03/1993 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/03/1993 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/03/1993 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/13/1993 | Information regarding cause received | | |
01/13/1993 | Information regarding cause received | | |
01/05/1993 | Information regarding cause received | | |
01/05/1993 | Information regarding cause received | | |
08/04/1992 | Information regarding cause received | | |
08/04/1992 | Information regarding cause received | | |
07/08/1992 | Submitted | | |
07/08/1992 | Submission | | |
07/08/1992 | Submitted | | |
06/12/1992 | Information regarding cause received | | |
06/12/1992 | Information regarding cause received | | |
06/05/1992 | Submission | | |
04/02/1992 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/02/1992 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/14/1992 | Information regarding cause received | | |
02/14/1992 | Information regarding cause received | | |
02/14/1992 | Information regarding cause received | | |
02/14/1992 | Information regarding cause received | | |
02/11/1992 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
02/11/1992 | Brief Filed | | |
02/04/1992 | Information regarding cause received | | |
02/04/1992 | Information regarding cause received | | |
01/17/1992 | Brief Filed | | |
01/17/1992 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
12/19/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
12/19/1991 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
10/29/1991 | No Description Available. | | |
10/28/1991 | Affidavit of Inability Filed | | |
10/22/1991 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/20/1993 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Housing Authority of the City of San Antonio | Appellee | Timothy J. Daniels |
Imperial Bedding Co., Et Al | Appellee | |
Ruben Garcia | Appellant | Warren Weir |
K-mart Corporation, Et Al | Appellee | John Milano, Jr. |
Trial Court Information
285th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Charles A Gonzalez
87-CI-22965-A
N/A