Case Information: 42744 | |||
Short Caption: | BAILEY & DUTTON VS. JUSTUS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0304564 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/11/2004 / King, Patrick | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/04/2004 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of James Shields Beasley, Esq.--check no. 4499. | ||
02/04/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 04-02213 | |
02/11/2004 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/19/2004 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 04-03257 | |
02/25/2004 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Patrick O. King. (docketing statement) | ||
03/09/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Appellants Bailey & Dutton, Bailey & McGah, Bailey, Inc., Dutton Enterprises, Ltd., S & V, Inc., and Pacheco Company, Inc.'s Motion to Stay the District Court's Order Granting a Corrective Notice Pending Appeal. | 04-04459 | |
03/09/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 04-04494 | |
03/10/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Presently before the court is appellants' motion to stay the notice instruction. Four factors guide our consideration of a motion for a stay: (1) whether the object of the appeal will be defeated if the stay is denied; (2) whether appellants will suffer irreparable or serious injury if the stay is denied; (3) whether respondents will suffer irreparable or serious injury if the stay is granted; and (4) whether appellants are likely to prevail on the merits. We have considered these factors and have determined that they weigh against granting a stay. Accordingly, we deny the motion. [fn 2 We defer fuling on respondents' March 9, 2004 motion to dismiss, pending our receipt and consideration of any opposition to the motion.] | 04-04548 | |
03/19/2004 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellants Bailey & Dutton, Bailey & McGah, Bailey, Inc., Dutton Enterprises, Ltd., S&V, Inc. and Pacheco Company, Inc.'s Opposition to Respondents Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 04-05285 | |
03/19/2004 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. (Opposition). | 04-05286 | |
03/29/2004 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Respondents' Motion for Leave to File a Reply. | 04-05825 | |
07/06/2004 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The Settlement Judge recommends this matter be removed from the Settlement Conference program. | 04-12309 | |
07/22/2004 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. Pursuant to the written request of the settlement judge and good cause appearing, this appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Briefing and the requesting of transcripts shall remain suspended, however, pending resolution of respondents' motion to dismiss this appeal. | 04-13282 | |
11/02/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Presently before the court is respondents' motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Appellants have filed an opposition. As this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal, we grant respondents' motion, and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn4[Respondents' motion for leave to file a reply is denied as moot. Respondents' request for sanctions is denied. NNP04-NB/DA/MG | 04-20204 | |
11/30/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-20502 | |
11/30/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/09/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 1, 2004. | 04-20502 |