judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THOMAS A. FIELDS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0568
Short Caption:THOMAS A. FIELDS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead: 88-CF-0536 Consolidated:88-CF-0568, 88-CF-0614
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14421-87Filed Date:05/16/1988

Opening Event Date:05/16/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/12/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/04/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/28/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/16/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantThomas A. Fields N
Steven R. KiershYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Norman C. Bay YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FIELDS, THOMAS A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: WILLIAM LUMPKIN, NOTE - 01 HERBERT AUSTIN & NOTE - 02 GERALD D. NEWSOME NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 111488 ORDER: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 03 THOMAS CLANCY, ESQ. TO W/DRAW NOTE - 04 AS COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 88-536; NOTE - 04 & APPNTNG DAVID C. GRAY; FO: NOTE - 05 THOMAS CLANCY TO TRANSMIT TO NOTE - 05 NEWLY APPNTD COUNSEL THE REC NOTE - 06 INCLUDING RT & ANY MATERIAL NOTE - 06 NEC FOR COUNS USE IN THE CASE; NOTE - 07 FO: SS, CONS 88-536 & 88-568 NOTE - 07 AND APLTS BRS DUE 40 DAYS AFT NOTE - 08 RT HAS BEEN FILED. NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 CON 88-536 NOTE - 09 NOTE - 10 BRIEF OF APLT IN 88-614 IS NOTE - 10 FILED. FO THAT BRIEF OF APLE NOTE - 11 SHALL BE FILED W/I 30 DAYS NOTE - 11 FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/11/28 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KIERSHS FOR - FIELDS ATTY 2 - TAYLORE FOR - AUSTIN ATTY 3 - GRAYD FOR - LUMPKIN TRDATE- 90/11/28 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BAYN FOR - APPELLEE
05/16/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/27/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN R. KIERSH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD DSA
07/21/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 071588 SCHPRD R
07/26/1988RECEIVED PRO SE MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1988LETTER LTR TO COUNSEL FOR APLT RE: APLT'S 7/26/88 PLEADING. DAS PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03 - 08. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1988FiledRecord Completed
01/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(20 PGS/SCHERTZER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (JUDGE WALTON'S ORDER, DTD 1/18/89) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989ORDER SS CONS 88-614 88-536 & 88-568 APLTS BRS IN 88-536 & 88-614 DUE IN 40 DAYS; APLE 30 AFT. PANELRBH SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD RT
04/14/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (ORDER DATED 4/3/89, JUDGE WALTON IN 88-614) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 88-536 & 88-614 TO 6-5-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 042689 SCHPRD BA
06/05/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF OF APPELLANT IN 88-536 TO JUNE 15, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO IN 88-536 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/15/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD OPE
06/14/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO HOLD BRIEFING IN ABEYANCE FOR 40 DAYS TO JULY 25TH IN 88-536 JB PANEL SCDATE 061589 SCHPRD BA
07/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD IN 88-614 #5(150 PGS/SWARINGER ) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT IN 88-536 TO EXTENT BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 062689 SCHPRD OPE
08/16/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-536 RJG PANEL SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD BA
01/08/1990ORDER DIRG THAT APLT'S BR IN 88-614 BE FLD W/IN 20 DAYS; FO APLE'S BR DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTR. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 88-614 TO 2/28/90 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD BA
02/12/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 2/28/90 IN NO. 88-614. NFX FVH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN NO. 88-614 JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO FOR AN EXT TM TO FL BRIEF IN 88-614 & LODGED SEE NOTE FIELDS 10 THRU 11 JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 022890 SCHPRD BA
05/04/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-4-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 050490 SCHPRD BE
05/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(ORDER JUDGE CUSHENBERRT DATED 5-1-90 ) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/29/1990ORDER GRT APLE'S MO X TM TO FL BRIEF TO 6/4/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 052390 SCHPRD B
05/31/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7(5 PGS/SWARINGER) IN 88-614 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/04/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/04/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD BE
10/09/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO POSTPONE/CONTINUE ARGUMENT UNTIL NOVEMBER 12, 1990 OR AFTER RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1990ORDER GRANT MOT OF APLT TO POSTPONE; CASES REMOVED FROM 11/6 REG CAL; RESCHED ASAP. MEH PANELROFETY SCDATE 101090 SCHPRD VS
11/16/1990ORDER SUA SPONTE ORDER SCHEDULING CASE FOR ARGUMENT 11/28 AT 3:00 PM. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 111590 SCHPRD CHECK
11/28/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/28/1990ARGUED PANELRGFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1991AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART JUDGMENT AF IN PART JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION/CAUSE RM w/ INSTRUCTIONS SET FORTH IN OP. PANELRGFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRM METH -OPN JUDGE -FE CITE
01/31/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 0366 OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 0000 (CC/DS IN PART)
04/16/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD