judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JESSE L. SIMMS, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0553
Short Caption:JESSE L. SIMMS, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8153-85Filed Date:04/29/1988

Opening Event Date:04/29/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/24/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJesse L. Simms, Jr.N
Joseph H. Green, Jr.NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SIMMS JR., JESSE L. UNITED STATES
04/29/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/20/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOSEPH H. GREEN, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1988FiledRecord Completed
06/24/1988RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 062888 SCHPRD R
06/27/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1988ORDER APLT DOCKETING STATE DUE IN 10 DAYS. (VACATED BY 7/22/88 ORD) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 053188 SCHPRD DSA
07/15/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA OR VACATE APPNTMNT & REFER TO BPR. (ORD VACATED) PANELPY SCDATE 070888 SCHPRD DSA
07/22/1988ORDER SS, VACATING 6/28 & 7/15/88 ORDERS, APLT BR DUE 8/8/88. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072588 SCHPRD DSA
08/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL FORTY (40) DAYS GT PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BA
09/09/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 091788 SCHPRD BA
09/09/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 9/17/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 090788 SCHPRD V
09/15/1988LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT, RESPONSE DUE BY 10/17/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 091588 SCHPRD X
10/21/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 9/15/88 ANDERS LETTER MLR (PRO SE) PANEL SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD ANSA
12/23/1988AFFIRMED JUDGMENT GRANTING COUNSEL'S MO TO W/DRAW & AFFIRMING JUDGMENT ON APPEAL. ACG PANELROST SCDATE 122088 SCHPRD VS
12/23/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
01/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD